Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Gifts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0017 /CH0109
Title
Campaign Finance – Recurring Contributions and Donations – Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0093
Title
Candidates for Offices of Municipalities and Common Ownership Communities - Reports of Donations and Disbursements
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0096
Title
Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ Transplantation - Financial Status
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0291 /CH0624 (SB0101/CH0625)
Title
Election Law - Contested Elections
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0344
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Contributions (Prohibiting Pay to Play Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0383 /CH0446 (SB0438/CH0447)
Title
Young Readers Programs – Establishment (Young Readers Program Expansion Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0384
Title
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Bronchodilator and Epinephrine Availability and Use - Policies
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0730 /CH0248 (SB0473/CH0249)
Title
Economic Development – Maryland E–Nnovation Initiative Program – Qualifying Donations
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0775 /CH0253
Title
Maryland Pediatric Cancer Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0907 /CH0621 (SB0589/CH0622)
Title
University of Maryland, Baltimore Campus - Employees - Authorization to Fund-Raise
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0941
Title
Income Tax Checkoff – Lions Vision Research Foundation
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1162
Title
Campaign Finance - Collections by Membership Entities - Noncampaign Political Activity
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1343
Title
Major State Contractors - Donations to Advocacy Organizations - Disclosure
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0038 /CH0185
Title
Public Safety - Fire and Rescue - Veterinary Care of Retired Fire and Rescue K-9s
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0101 /CH0625 (HB0291/CH0624)
Title
Election Law - Contested Elections
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0154
Title
Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0358
Title
Public Financing Act – State Senate and House of Delegates
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0438 /CH0447 (HB0383/CH0446)
Title
Young Readers Programs - Establishment (Young Readers Program Expansion Act)
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0473 /CH0249 (HB0730/CH0248)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program - Qualifying Donations
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0589 /CH0622 (HB0907/CH0621)
Title
University of Maryland, Baltimore Campus - Employees - Authorization to Fund-Raise
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0017 /CH0109 Campaign Finance – Recurring Contributions and Donations – Requirements Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 109
Ways and Means
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0093 Candidates for Offices of Municipalities and Common Ownership Communities - Reports of Donations and Disbursements Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0096 Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ Transplantation - Financial Status Delegate Shetty 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
1/26/2022 - 3:00 PM
HB0291 /CH0624 (SB0101/CH0625) Election Law - Contested Elections Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 624
Ways and Means
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0344 Election Law - Campaign Finance - Contributions (Prohibiting Pay to Play Act of 2022) Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0383 /CH0446 (SB0438/CH0447) Young Readers Programs – Establishment (Young Readers Program Expansion Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446
Ways and Means
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0384 Public and Nonpublic Schools - Bronchodilator and Epinephrine Availability and Use - Policies Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0730 /CH0248 (SB0473/CH0249) Economic Development – Maryland E–Nnovation Initiative Program – Qualifying Donations Delegate Buckel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248
Ways and Means
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0775 /CH0253 Maryland Pediatric Cancer Fund - Establishment Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2022 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
Finance
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0907 /CH0621 (SB0589/CH0622) University of Maryland, Baltimore Campus - Employees - Authorization to Fund-Raise Delegate Chang 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 621
Appropriations
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0941 Income Tax Checkoff – Lions Vision Research Foundation Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1162 Campaign Finance - Collections by Membership Entities - Noncampaign Political Activity Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1343 Major State Contractors - Donations to Advocacy Organizations - Disclosure Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0038 /CH0185 Public Safety - Fire and Rescue - Veterinary Care of Retired Fire and Rescue K-9s Senator Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Judicial Proceedings
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/06/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0101 /CH0625 (HB0291/CH0624) Election Law - Contested Elections Senator Kagan 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 625
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2022 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
SB0154 Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0358 Public Financing Act – State Senate and House of Delegates Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0438 /CH0447 (HB0383/CH0446) Young Readers Programs - Establishment (Young Readers Program Expansion Act) Senator McCray 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0473 /CH0249 (HB0730/CH0248) Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program - Qualifying Donations Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Budget and Taxation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0589 /CH0622 (HB0907/CH0621) University of Maryland, Baltimore Campus - Employees - Authorization to Fund-Raise Senator Hayes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 622
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2022 - 1:03 PM
Appropriations
4/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:16 PM
Click to return on the top page