Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Genetics

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0249
Title
Public Safety - Statewide DNA Database System, DNA Collection, and Penalties - Alterations
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0476 /CH0830 (SB0549/CH0831)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forensic Genetic Genealogical DNA Analysis and Search - Applicability for Deceased and Missing Individuals
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0567 /CH0454 (SB0541/CH0455)
Title
Maryland Online Data Privacy Act of 2024
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0575 /CH0705 (SB0471)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim Compensation - Alterations (Victim Compensation Reform Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0676 /CH0960
Title
Right to Try Act - Individualized Investigational Treatments
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0722
Title
Health – Minors – Gender and Sex Transition Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0982 (SB0142)
Title
Genetic Testing - Prohibitions on Disability, Life, and Long-Term Care Insurance (Genetic Testing Protection Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1421 (SB0911)
Title
Food, Drugs, and Cosmetics - Gene Structure- and Function-Modifying Products - Labeling
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1422 (SB0914)
Title
Human Relations – Protections Against Discrimination – Genetic Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0142 (HB0982)
Title
Genetic Testing - Prohibitions on Disability, Life, and Long-Term Care Insurance (Genetic Testing Protection Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0471 (HB0575/CH0705)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim Compensation - Alterations (Victim Compensation Reform Act of 2024)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0541 /CH0455 (HB0567/CH0454)
Title
Maryland Online Data Privacy Act of 2024
Sponsor
Senator Gile
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0549 /CH0831 (HB0476/CH0830)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forensic Genetic Genealogical DNA Analysis and Search - Applicability for Deceased and Missing Individuals
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0911 (HB1421)
Title
Food, Drugs, and Cosmetics - Gene Structure- and Function-Modifying Products - Labeling
Sponsor
Senator McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0914 (HB1422)
Title
Human Relations - Protections Against Discrimination - Genetic Procedures
Sponsor
Senator McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0249 Public Safety - Statewide DNA Database System, DNA Collection, and Penalties - Alterations Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0476 /CH0830 (SB0549/CH0831) Criminal Procedure - Forensic Genetic Genealogical DNA Analysis and Search - Applicability for Deceased and Missing Individuals Delegate Bartlett 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 830
Judiciary
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0567 /CH0454 (SB0541/CH0455) Maryland Online Data Privacy Act of 2024 Delegate Love 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Economic Matters
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0575 /CH0705 (SB0471) Criminal Procedure - Victim Compensation - Alterations (Victim Compensation Reform Act of 2024) Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 705
Judiciary
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0676 /CH0960 Right to Try Act - Individualized Investigational Treatments Delegate Morgan, M. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 960
Health and Government Operations
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0722 Health – Minors – Gender and Sex Transition Procedures Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0982 (SB0142) Genetic Testing - Prohibitions on Disability, Life, and Long-Term Care Insurance (Genetic Testing Protection Act of 2024) Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1421 (SB0911) Food, Drugs, and Cosmetics - Gene Structure- and Function-Modifying Products - Labeling Delegate Johnson, S. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1422 (SB0914) Human Relations – Protections Against Discrimination – Genetic Procedures Delegate Johnson, S. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB0142 (HB0982) Genetic Testing - Prohibitions on Disability, Life, and Long-Term Care Insurance (Genetic Testing Protection Act of 2024) Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0471 (HB0575/CH0705) Criminal Procedure - Victim Compensation - Alterations (Victim Compensation Reform Act of 2024) President 3 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2024 - 12:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0541 /CH0455 (HB0567/CH0454) Maryland Online Data Privacy Act of 2024 Senator Gile 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 455
Finance
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0549 /CH0831 (HB0476/CH0830) Criminal Procedure - Forensic Genetic Genealogical DNA Analysis and Search - Applicability for Deceased and Missing Individuals Senator Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 831
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2024 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0911 (HB1421) Food, Drugs, and Cosmetics - Gene Structure- and Function-Modifying Products - Labeling Senator McKay 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0914 (HB1422) Human Relations - Protections Against Discrimination - Genetic Procedures Senator McKay 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:47 PM
Click to return on the top page