Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Genetics

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0142
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage of In Vitro Fertilization - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0259 (SB0335)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Biometric Data Privacy
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0866 /CH0501 (SB0766)
Title
Genetic Information Privacy - Consumer Protection and Forensic Genealogy
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0953
Title
Parent and Guardian Rights - Education, Health, and Upbringing of Children
Sponsor
Delegate Novotny
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0962 /CH0502 (SB0643/CH0503)
Title
Commercial Law – Maryland Personal Information Protection Act – Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139
Title
Public Funds - Prohibition on Expenditures for Abortion (Abortion Subsidy Prohibition Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1214
Title
Maryland Child Protection Act of 2022
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1463
Title
Biometric Authentication Requirements for Governmental Services - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0011
Title
Workgroup on Online Consumer Personal Information Privacy
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0335 (HB0259)
Title
Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Biometric Identifiers Privacy
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0643 /CH0503 (HB0962/CH0502)
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0766 (HB0866/CH0501)
Title
Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Genetic Information Privacy
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0142 Health Insurance - Coverage of In Vitro Fertilization - Revisions Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 4:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
1/27/2022 - 4:00 PM
HB0259 (SB0335) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Biometric Data Privacy Delegate Love 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Economic Matters
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0866 /CH0501 (SB0766) Genetic Information Privacy - Consumer Protection and Forensic Genealogy Delegate Qi 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 501
Economic Matters
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0953 Parent and Guardian Rights - Education, Health, and Upbringing of Children Delegate Novotny 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 12:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2022 - 12:30 PM
HB0962 /CH0502 (SB0643/CH0503) Commercial Law – Maryland Personal Information Protection Act – Revisions Delegate Carey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 502
Economic Matters
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1139 Public Funds - Prohibition on Expenditures for Abortion (Abortion Subsidy Prohibition Act) Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1214 Maryland Child Protection Act of 2022 Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB1463 Biometric Authentication Requirements for Governmental Services - Prohibition Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0011 Workgroup on Online Consumer Personal Information Privacy Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Finance
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0335 (HB0259) Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Biometric Identifiers Privacy Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0643 /CH0503 (HB0962/CH0502) Commercial Law - Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions Senator Lee 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 503
Finance
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0766 (HB0866/CH0501) Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Genetic Information Privacy Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:14 PM
Click to return on the top page