Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Genetics

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0148 (SB0112)
Title
Commercial Law - Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0218 (SB0016)
Title
Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0240 (SB0187)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forensic Genetic Genealogical DNA Analysis, Searching, Regulation, and Oversight
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0299 (SB0034)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Genetic Counselors - Licensing
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1256
Title
Maryland Department of Health – Gene Synthesis Providers and Manufacturers of Gene Synthesis Equipment – Certification
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0016 (HB0218)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0034 (HB0299)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Genetic Counselors - Licensing
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0112 (HB0148)
Title
Commercial Law - Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0187 (HB0240)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Forensic Genetic Genealogical DNA Analysis, Searching, Regulation, and Oversight
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0148 (SB0112) Commercial Law - Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions Delegate Carey 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Economic Matters
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0218 (SB0016) Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0240 (SB0187) Criminal Procedure - Forensic Genetic Genealogical DNA Analysis, Searching, Regulation, and Oversight Delegate Shetty 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Judiciary
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0299 (SB0034) State Board of Physicians - Genetic Counselors - Licensing Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1256 Maryland Department of Health – Gene Synthesis Providers and Manufacturers of Gene Synthesis Equipment – Certification Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0016 (HB0218) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0034 (HB0299) State Board of Physicians - Genetic Counselors - Licensing Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0112 (HB0148) Commercial Law - Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0187 (HB0240) Criminal Procedure – Forensic Genetic Genealogical DNA Analysis, Searching, Regulation, and Oversight Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 9:52 AM
Click to return on the top page