Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

General Services, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0078 /CH0749 (SB0052/CH0750)
Title
Public Health - Maryland Commission on Health Equity (The Shirley Nathan-Pulliam Health Equity Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0122 (SB0380)
Title
Maryland Office of the Inspector General for General Services
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0129 (SB0070)
Title
Environment - Mold Inspections - Standards, Reporting, and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0164 /CH0289 (SB0116/CH0290)
Title
Department of the Environment – Office of Recycling – Recycling Market Development
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0236
Title
Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0317
Title
Maryland Green Purchasing Committee - Food and Beverage Procurement - Greenhouse Gas Emissions
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0419 (SB0460)
Title
Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0787 (SB0718)
Title
Burtonsville Crossing – Acquisition by the Department of General Services
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0803 (SB0835)
Title
Facilitating University Transformations by Unifying Reductions in Emissions (FUTURE) Act
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1055
Title
Capital Budget - Legislative Initiatives - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1091 (SB0829)
Title
State Procurement - Emergency and Expedited Procurements - Revisions and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1214
Title
Procurement - Transparency and Application to County Contracts
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1348 (SB0649)
Title
Procurement - Department of General Services - MBE Program Compliance Officer
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0052 /CH0750 (HB0078/CH0749)
Title
Public Health – Maryland Commission on Health Equity (The Shirley Nathan–Pulliam Health Equity Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0070 (HB0129)
Title
Environment - Mold Inspections - Standards, Reporting, and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0116 /CH0290 (HB0164/CH0289)
Title
Department of the Environment - Office of Recycling - Recycling Market Development
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0380 (HB0122)
Title
Maryland Office of the Inspector General for General Services
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0460 (HB0419)
Title
Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0645
Title
9–1–1 Board – Procurement Reform
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0649 (HB1348)
Title
Procurement - MBE Program Compliance Review and Oversight
Sponsor
Senator Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0718 (HB0787)
Title
Burtonsville Crossing – Acquisition by the Department of General Services
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0835 (HB0803)
Title
Facilitating University Transformations by Unifying Reductions in Emissions (FUTURE) Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0078 /CH0749 (SB0052/CH0750) Public Health - Maryland Commission on Health Equity (The Shirley Nathan-Pulliam Health Equity Act of 2021) Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 749
Health and Government Operations
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0122 (SB0380) Maryland Office of the Inspector General for General Services Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0129 (SB0070) Environment - Mold Inspections - Standards, Reporting, and Penalties Delegate Henson 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0164 /CH0289 (SB0116/CH0290) Department of the Environment – Office of Recycling – Recycling Market Development Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
Environment and Transportation
1/15/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0236 Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2021) Delegate Hill 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0317 Maryland Green Purchasing Committee - Food and Beverage Procurement - Greenhouse Gas Emissions Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0419 (SB0460) Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives Delegate Qi 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Economic Matters
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0787 (SB0718) Burtonsville Crossing – Acquisition by the Department of General Services Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0803 (SB0835) Facilitating University Transformations by Unifying Reductions in Emissions (FUTURE) Act Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1055 Capital Budget - Legislative Initiatives - Alterations Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1091 (SB0829) State Procurement - Emergency and Expedited Procurements - Revisions and Reporting Delegate Reznik 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Appropriations
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1214 Procurement - Transparency and Application to County Contracts Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1348 (SB0649) Procurement - Department of General Services - MBE Program Compliance Officer Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
SB0052 /CH0750 (HB0078/CH0749) Public Health – Maryland Commission on Health Equity (The Shirley Nathan–Pulliam Health Equity Act of 2021) Senator Washington 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 750
Finance
Health and Government Operations
SB0070 (HB0129) Environment - Mold Inspections - Standards, Reporting, and Penalties Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0116 /CH0290 (HB0164/CH0289) Department of the Environment - Office of Recycling - Recycling Market Development Senator Kagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 290
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
SB0380 (HB0122) Maryland Office of the Inspector General for General Services Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0460 (HB0419) Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives Senator Feldman 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Finance
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0645 9–1–1 Board – Procurement Reform Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0649 (HB1348) Procurement - MBE Program Compliance Review and Oversight Senator Griffith 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0718 (HB0787) Burtonsville Crossing – Acquisition by the Department of General Services Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0835 (HB0803) Facilitating University Transformations by Unifying Reductions in Emissions (FUTURE) Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:18 AM
Click to return on the top page