Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Garrett County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0632 /CH0529 (SB0451/CH0530)
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0637 /CH0279 (SB0453/CH0280)
Title
Allegany County and Garrett County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0655
Title
Local Elections - County Commissioner and County Boards of Education - District Voting
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0929 (SB0680/CH0216)
Title
Teachers’ Pension System – Vested Allowance – Break in Service
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1059 /CH0541 (SB0731/CH0542)
Title
Allegany and Garrett Counties - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permits
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1127 /CH0601 (SB0804/CH0602)
Title
Garrett County – Memorial Hospital – Board Membership and Meetings
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1128 (SB0676)
Title
Garrett County – Public Schools – Virtual Education Days
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1279 /CH0206 (SB0778/CH0207)
Title
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1374 /CH0576
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0451 /CH0530 (HB0632/CH0529)
Title
Garrett County – Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0453 /CH0280 (HB0637/CH0279)
Title
Allegany County and Garrett County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0676 (HB1128)
Title
Garrett County - Public Schools - Virtual Education Days Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0680 /CH0216 (HB0929)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Administration of Benefits - Clarification
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0731 /CH0542 (HB1059/CH0541)
Title
Allegany and Garrett Counties – Alcoholic Beverages – Gift Basket Permits
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0778 /CH0207 (HB1279/CH0206)
Title
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program – Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0804 /CH0602 (HB1127/CH0601)
Title
Garrett County - Memorial Hospital - Board Membership and Meetings
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0632 /CH0529 (SB0451/CH0530) Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2021 Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 529
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0637 /CH0279 (SB0453/CH0280) Allegany County and Garrett County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 279
Environment and Transportation
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0655 Local Elections - County Commissioner and County Boards of Education - District Voting Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0929 (SB0680/CH0216) Teachers’ Pension System – Vested Allowance – Break in Service Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1059 /CH0541 (SB0731/CH0542) Allegany and Garrett Counties - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permits Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 541
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1127 /CH0601 (SB0804/CH0602) Garrett County – Memorial Hospital – Board Membership and Meetings Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 601
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1128 (SB0676) Garrett County – Public Schools – Virtual Education Days Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1279 /CH0206 (SB0778/CH0207) Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program - Alterations Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 206
Ways and Means
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1374 /CH0576 Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 576
Appropriations
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0451 /CH0530 (HB0632/CH0529) Garrett County – Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2021 Senator Edwards 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 530
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0453 /CH0280 (HB0637/CH0279) Allegany County and Garrett County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 280
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0676 (HB1128) Garrett County - Public Schools - Virtual Education Days Pilot Program Senator Edwards 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0680 /CH0216 (HB0929) State Retirement and Pension System - Administration of Benefits - Clarification Senator Jennings 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2021 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0731 /CH0542 (HB1059/CH0541) Allegany and Garrett Counties – Alcoholic Beverages – Gift Basket Permits Senator Edwards 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 542
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0778 /CH0207 (HB1279/CH0206) Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program – Alterations Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0804 /CH0602 (HB1127/CH0601) Garrett County - Memorial Hospital - Board Membership and Meetings Senator Edwards 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 602
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:17 PM
Click to return on the top page