Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Ethics (G2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0166 (SB0185)
Title
Maryland Public Ethics Law - State Officials of and Candidates to be State Officials of the Judicial Branch - Conflicts of Interest and Financial Disclosure Statements
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0230 /CH0073 (SB0251/CH0074)
Title
Maryland Public Ethics Law - Training and Financial Disclosure Requirements - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0717
Title
Natural Resources - Public Lands - Acquisition, Staffing, Operations, and Funding
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0932 (SB0723)
Title
Public Ethics - Conflicts of Interest and Blind Trust - Governor
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1297
Title
Public Ethics - Local Government and School Boards - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1542
Title
Maryland Public Ethics Law - Regulated Lobbyists - Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1558 (SB1047)
Title
Election Law - State Elected Officials - Fundraising Activities During General Assembly Session
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0109
Title
Maryland Public Ethics Law - School Boards - Compliance Certification
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0145
Title
Public Information Act - Personnel Records of Elected Officials and Joint Ethics Committee Records
Sponsor
Senator Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0185 (HB0166)
Title
Maryland Public Ethics Law - State Officials of and Candidates to be State Officials of the Judicial Branch - Conflicts of Interest and Financial Disclosure Statements
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0251 /CH0074 (HB0230/CH0073)
Title
Maryland Public Ethics Law - Training and Financial Disclosure Requirements - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0723 (HB0932)
Title
Public Ethics - Conflicts of Interest and Blind Trust - Governor
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1047 (HB1558)
Title
Election Law - State Elected Officials - Fundraising Activities During General Assembly Session
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0166 (SB0185) Maryland Public Ethics Law - State Officials of and Candidates to be State Officials of the Judicial Branch - Conflicts of Interest and Financial Disclosure Statements Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
1/24/2025 - 2:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0230 /CH0073 (SB0251/CH0074) Maryland Public Ethics Law - Training and Financial Disclosure Requirements - Revisions Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 73
Environment and Transportation
1/30/2025 - 1:30 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0717 Natural Resources - Public Lands - Acquisition, Staffing, Operations, and Funding Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0932 (SB0723) Public Ethics - Conflicts of Interest and Blind Trust - Governor Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1297 Public Ethics - Local Government and School Boards - Requirements Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Reassigned to Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1542 Maryland Public Ethics Law - Regulated Lobbyists - Reporting Requirements Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1558 (SB1047) Election Law - State Elected Officials - Fundraising Activities During General Assembly Session Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0109 Maryland Public Ethics Law - School Boards - Compliance Certification Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/15/2025 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0145 Public Information Act - Personnel Records of Elected Officials and Joint Ethics Committee Records Senator Folden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0185 (HB0166) Maryland Public Ethics Law - State Officials of and Candidates to be State Officials of the Judicial Branch - Conflicts of Interest and Financial Disclosure Statements Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0251 /CH0074 (HB0230/CH0073) Maryland Public Ethics Law - Training and Financial Disclosure Requirements - Revisions Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 74
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/15/2025 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0723 (HB0932) Public Ethics - Conflicts of Interest and Blind Trust - Governor Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB1047 (HB1558) Election Law - State Elected Officials - Fundraising Activities During General Assembly Session Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/10/2025 3:48 PM
Click to return on the top page