Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Ethics (G2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0059
Title
Ethics – Local Governments – Registration of Lobbyists
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0904
Title
State-Related Institutions - Required Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0907 /CH0621 (SB0589/CH0622)
Title
University of Maryland, Baltimore Campus - Employees - Authorization to Fund-Raise
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1059 /CH0284
Title
Bicounty Commissions - Ethics - Certification of Compliance PG/MC 103-22
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1136
Title
Public Ethics – Former Employees and Officials – Employment Restriction
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1343
Title
Major State Contractors - Donations to Advocacy Organizations - Disclosure
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0570
Title
Public Ethics – Former Secretary, Deputy Secretary, or Assistant Secretary of a Principal Department – Employment Restrictions
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0589 /CH0622 (HB0907/CH0621)
Title
University of Maryland, Baltimore Campus - Employees - Authorization to Fund-Raise
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0059 Ethics – Local Governments – Registration of Lobbyists Delegate Carr 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0904 State-Related Institutions - Required Reports Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
HB0907 /CH0621 (SB0589/CH0622) University of Maryland, Baltimore Campus - Employees - Authorization to Fund-Raise Delegate Chang 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 621
Appropriations
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1059 /CH0284 Bicounty Commissions - Ethics - Certification of Compliance PG/MC 103-22 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 284
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1136 Public Ethics – Former Employees and Officials – Employment Restriction Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1343 Major State Contractors - Donations to Advocacy Organizations - Disclosure Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0570 Public Ethics – Former Secretary, Deputy Secretary, or Assistant Secretary of a Principal Department – Employment Restrictions Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0589 /CH0622 (HB0907/CH0621) University of Maryland, Baltimore Campus - Employees - Authorization to Fund-Raise Senator Hayes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 622
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2022 - 1:03 PM
Appropriations
4/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/24/2022 9:55 AM
Click to return on the top page