Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Funerals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0152
Title
Department of the Environment - Study on Deathcare and Funeral Practices
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0575 /CH0705 (SB0471)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim Compensation - Alterations (Victim Compensation Reform Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0756 /CH0481 (SB0573/CH0480)
Title
General Provisions - State Flag - Casket of an Eligible Decedent
Sponsor
Delegate Hutchinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0471 (HB0575/CH0705)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim Compensation - Alterations (Victim Compensation Reform Act of 2024)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0573 /CH0480 (HB0756/CH0481)
Title
General Provisions - State Flag - Casket of an Eligible Decedent
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0850 /CH0479
Title
State Personnel - Line-of-Duty Death and Funeral Benefits
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0893
Title
Environment - Siting Requirements for Crematories and Crematory Incinerators - Areas III and IV
Sponsor
Senator Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0152 Department of the Environment - Study on Deathcare and Funeral Practices Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Health and Government Operations
1/23/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0575 /CH0705 (SB0471) Criminal Procedure - Victim Compensation - Alterations (Victim Compensation Reform Act of 2024) Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 705
Judiciary
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0756 /CH0481 (SB0573/CH0480) General Provisions - State Flag - Casket of an Eligible Decedent Delegate Hutchinson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 481
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
SB0471 (HB0575/CH0705) Criminal Procedure - Victim Compensation - Alterations (Victim Compensation Reform Act of 2024) President 3 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2024 - 12:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0573 /CH0480 (HB0756/CH0481) General Provisions - State Flag - Casket of an Eligible Decedent Senator Corderman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 480
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0850 /CH0479 State Personnel - Line-of-Duty Death and Funeral Benefits Senator Corderman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 479
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0893 Environment - Siting Requirements for Crematories and Crematory Incinerators - Areas III and IV Senator Washington, M. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:36 PM
Click to return on the top page