Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Funerals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0604 /CH0338 (SB0180/CH0339)
Title
Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans - Notification, Disposition, and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0180 /CH0339 (HB0604/CH0338)
Title
Funeral Establishments and Crematories – Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans – Notification, Disposition, and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0353 /CH0312
Title
Veterans – Benefits and Benefits Appeals Services – Disclosure Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736
Economic Matters
2/05/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
Finance
4/09/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB0604 /CH0338 (SB0180/CH0339) Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans - Notification, Disposition, and Reporting Delegate Kipke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 338
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0180 /CH0339 (HB0604/CH0338) Funeral Establishments and Crematories – Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans – Notification, Disposition, and Reporting Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0353 /CH0312 Veterans – Benefits and Benefits Appeals Services – Disclosure Requirements Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2021 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:19 AM
Click to return on the top page