Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Fuel Tax

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0144 (SB0337)
Title
Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0577
Title
Motor Fuel Tax and Sales and Use Tax - Tax Holiday
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1191 (SB0737)
Title
Cost of Living Assistance Act of 2022
Sponsor
Delegate Novotny
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1486 /CH0001 (SB1010/CH0002)
Title
Motor Fuel Taxes – Tax–Free Period
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0337 (HB0144)
Title
Motor Fuel Tax Rates – Consumer Price Index Adjustment – Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0737 (HB1191)
Title
Cost of Living Assistance Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1010 /CH0002 (HB1486/CH0001)
Title
Motor Fuel Taxes - Tax-Free Period
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0144 (SB0337) Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal Delegate Morgan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0577 Motor Fuel Tax and Sales and Use Tax - Tax Holiday Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1191 (SB0737) Cost of Living Assistance Act of 2022 Delegate Novotny 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1486 /CH0001 (SB1010/CH0002) Motor Fuel Taxes – Tax–Free Period Delegate Johnson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1
Ways and Means
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/17/2022 - 4:30 PM
SB0337 (HB0144) Motor Fuel Tax Rates – Consumer Price Index Adjustment – Repeal Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/08/2022 - 2:30 PM
SB0737 (HB1191) Cost of Living Assistance Act of 2022 Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB1010 /CH0002 (HB1486/CH0001) Motor Fuel Taxes - Tax-Free Period President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 2
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/17/2022 - 4:15 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/18/2022 4:45 PM
Click to return on the top page