Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Frederick County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0116 (SB0242)
Title
Transportation – I–270 Commuter Bus Route Study
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0399 /CH0592
Title
Real Property – Required Notices for Contracts of Sale – Zones of Dewatering Influence
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0615
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Deer Hunting and Archery Hunting Safety Zones - Prince George's County PG 402-21
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0740 (SB0576)
Title
Building Opportunity Act of 2021
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0798 (SB0851)
Title
Frederick County Board of Education - Vacancies
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1240 /CH0564 (SB0693/CH0565)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1241 (SB0791)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Licenses - Off-Premises Consumption
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1242 /CH0561 (SB0793/CH0562)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption Permits
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1270 /CH0557 (SB0694/CH0558)
Title
Frederick County – Barbershop and Beauty Salon Beer and Wine Licenses – Alterations
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1272 /CH0559 (SB0792/CH0560)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Alcohol by Volume - Wine
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1353
Title
Frederick County - Small Business Property Tax Credit - Municipal Corporations
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1374 /CH0576
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0242 (HB0116)
Title
Transportation - I-270 Commuter Bus Route Study
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0576 (HB0740)
Title
Building Opportunity Act of 2021
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0693 /CH0565 (HB1240/CH0564)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0694 /CH0558 (HB1270/CH0557)
Title
Frederick County – Barbershop and Beauty Salon Beer and Wine Licenses – Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0791 (HB1241)
Title
Frederick County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class B Licenses – Off–Premises Consumption
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0792 /CH0560 (HB1272/CH0559)
Title
Frederick County – Alcoholic Beverages – Alcohol by Volume – Wine
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0793 /CH0562 (HB1242/CH0561)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption Permits
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0851 (HB0798)
Title
Frederick County Board of Education – Vacancies
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0116 (SB0242) Transportation – I–270 Commuter Bus Route Study Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0399 /CH0592 Real Property – Required Notices for Contracts of Sale – Zones of Dewatering Influence Delegate Krimm 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 592
Environment and Transportation
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2021 - 12:30 PM
HB0615 Natural Resources - Sunday Deer Hunting and Archery Hunting Safety Zones - Prince George's County PG 402-21 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0740 (SB0576) Building Opportunity Act of 2021 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
HB0798 (SB0851) Frederick County Board of Education - Vacancies Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/12/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1240 /CH0564 (SB0693/CH0565) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 564
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1241 (SB0791) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Licenses - Off-Premises Consumption Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1242 /CH0561 (SB0793/CH0562) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption Permits Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 561
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1270 /CH0557 (SB0694/CH0558) Frederick County – Barbershop and Beauty Salon Beer and Wine Licenses – Alterations Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 557
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1272 /CH0559 (SB0792/CH0560) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Alcohol by Volume - Wine Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 559
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1353 Frederick County - Small Business Property Tax Credit - Municipal Corporations Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1374 /CH0576 Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 576
Appropriations
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0242 (HB0116) Transportation - I-270 Commuter Bus Route Study Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0576 (HB0740) Building Opportunity Act of 2021 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Budget and Taxation
SB0693 /CH0565 (HB1240/CH0564) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License Senator Young 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 565
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0694 /CH0558 (HB1270/CH0557) Frederick County – Barbershop and Beauty Salon Beer and Wine Licenses – Alterations Senator Young 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 558
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0791 (HB1241) Frederick County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class B Licenses – Off–Premises Consumption Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
SB0792 /CH0560 (HB1272/CH0559) Frederick County – Alcoholic Beverages – Alcohol by Volume – Wine Senator Young 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 560
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0793 /CH0562 (HB1242/CH0561) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption Permits Senator Young 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 562
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0851 (HB0798) Frederick County Board of Education – Vacancies Senator Hough 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:07 PM
Click to return on the top page