Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Foster Care

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0008 (SB0275/CH0048)
Title
Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0406
Title
Children in Out–of–Home Placements – Placement in Medical Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0496
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0774
Title
Human Services – Universal Basic Income for Transition–Age Youth – Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1102 (SB0799)
Title
Community College Tuition and Residency Waivers - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1155
Title
Foster Parents, Kinship Parents, Preadoptive Parents, and Caregivers – Right to Intervene
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1163
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Education - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0203 /CH0228
Title
Children in Need of Assistance – Custody and Guardianship and Review Hearings
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0275 /CH0048 (HB0008)
Title
Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0799 (HB1102)
Title
Community College Tuition and Residency Waivers - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0910
Title
Nondiscrimination – Courts and Other Governmental Entities – Prohibitions, Policy, and Training (Access to Justice for All Youth)
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0008 (SB0275/CH0048) Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022) Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0406 Children in Out–of–Home Placements – Placement in Medical Facilities Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Appropriations
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0496 Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act 2022) Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0774 Human Services – Universal Basic Income for Transition–Age Youth – Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1102 (SB0799) Community College Tuition and Residency Waivers - Funding Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1155 Foster Parents, Kinship Parents, Preadoptive Parents, and Caregivers – Right to Intervene Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB1163 Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Education - Requirements Delegate Washington 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Ways and Means
3/09/2022 - 2:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0203 /CH0228 Children in Need of Assistance – Custody and Guardianship and Review Hearings Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Judicial Proceedings
1/13/2022 - 1:30 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0275 /CH0048 (HB0008) Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022) Senator Hayes 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 48
Finance
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0799 (HB1102) Community College Tuition and Residency Waivers - Funding Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0910 Nondiscrimination – Courts and Other Governmental Entities – Prohibitions, Policy, and Training (Access to Justice for All Youth) Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/31/2022 5:14 PM
Click to return on the top page