Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Forfeiture

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0123 (SB0141)
Title
Pensions and Retirement - Forfeiture of Benefits - Law Enforcement Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1054 (SB0784)
Title
Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1062 /CH0180 (SB0877)
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Petition for Costs for Care of Seized Animal
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1342
Title
Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Equity Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1429 (SB0763/CH0141)
Title
Collection and Publication of Criminal Case and Prosecutorial Information
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0047
Title
Pensions and Retirement - Forfeiture of Benefits - Law Enforcement Officers
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0141 (HB0123)
Title
Pensions and Retirement – Forfeiture of Benefits – Law Enforcement Officers
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0258
Title
Real Estate Investment Trust Modernization Act
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0763 /CH0141 (HB1429)
Title
Public Safety and Criminal Justice - Transparency and Accountability
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0784 (HB1054)
Title
Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0877 (HB1062/CH0180)
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Petition for Costs for Care of Seized Animal
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0123 (SB0141) Pensions and Retirement - Forfeiture of Benefits - Law Enforcement Officers Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1054 (SB0784) Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1062 /CH0180 (SB0877) Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Petition for Costs for Care of Seized Animal Delegate Moon 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Judiciary
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1342 Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Equity Act) Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1429 (SB0763/CH0141) Collection and Publication of Criminal Case and Prosecutorial Information Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0047 Pensions and Retirement - Forfeiture of Benefits - Law Enforcement Officers Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2022 - 9:00 AM
SB0141 (HB0123) Pensions and Retirement – Forfeiture of Benefits – Law Enforcement Officers Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2022 - 9:00 AM
SB0258 Real Estate Investment Trust Modernization Act Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0763 /CH0141 (HB1429) Public Safety and Criminal Justice - Transparency and Accountability Senator Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0784 (HB1054) Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0877 (HB1062/CH0180) Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Petition for Costs for Care of Seized Animal Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/24/2022 4:51 PM
Click to return on the top page