Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Forests and Parks -see also- Program Open Space; Trees

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0458
Title
Program Open Space - Local Projects - Visitor Behavior Policies
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0507 /CH0695 (SB0119/CH0694)
Title
Clean Water Commerce Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0589 /CH0150 (SB0493)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2021
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0622
Title
Prince George’s County – Land Use – Magnetic Levitation Transportation System Siting (Prince George’s County Stop the Maglev Act of 2021) PG 406–21
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0704
Title
Land Use – Magnetic Levitation Transportation System Siting (Maryland Stop the Maglev Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0847
Title
Criminal Procedure - Registered Sex Offenders - Residency Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0991 /CH0645
Title
Tree Solutions Now Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0119 /CH0694 (HB0507/CH0695)
Title
Clean Water Commerce Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0493 (HB0589/CH0150)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2021
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0663
Title
Charles County - Cemeteries - Sediment Control, Stormwater Management, and Forest Conservation
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0737
Title
Comprehensive Conservation Finance Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0458 Program Open Space - Local Projects - Visitor Behavior Policies Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0507 /CH0695 (SB0119/CH0694) Clean Water Commerce Act of 2021 Delegate Stein 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 695
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB0589 /CH0150 (SB0493) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2021 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 150
Appropriations
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0622 Prince George’s County – Land Use – Magnetic Levitation Transportation System Siting (Prince George’s County Stop the Maglev Act of 2021) PG 406–21 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0704 Land Use – Magnetic Levitation Transportation System Siting (Maryland Stop the Maglev Act of 2021) Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0847 Criminal Procedure - Registered Sex Offenders - Residency Restrictions Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0991 /CH0645 Tree Solutions Now Act of 2021 Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 645
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0119 /CH0694 (HB0507/CH0695) Clean Water Commerce Act of 2021 Senator Guzzone 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 694
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
Appropriations
SB0493 (HB0589/CH0150) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2021 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0663 Charles County - Cemeteries - Sediment Control, Stormwater Management, and Forest Conservation Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0737 Comprehensive Conservation Finance Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:17 AM
Click to return on the top page