Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Foreclosure

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0803
Title
Residential Property Foreclosure - Filing and Adjudication of Counterclaims
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0929
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Opportunity Zone Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1038
Title
Foreclosure Proceedings – Residential Mortgagors and Grantors – Access to Counsel
Sponsor
Delegate Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0217
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consumer Loans - Payments and Fees
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0967
Title
Tax Sales - Final Judgments in Foreclosure Actions - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0968
Title
Tax Sales - Foreclosure Actions - Assignment of Certificates of Sale
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0991
Title
Tax Sales - Foreclosure of Rights of Redemption
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0803 Residential Property Foreclosure - Filing and Adjudication of Counterclaims Delegate Williams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0929 Department of Housing and Community Development - Opportunity Zone Fund - Establishment Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1038 Foreclosure Proceedings – Residential Mortgagors and Grantors – Access to Counsel Delegate Charles 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0217 Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consumer Loans - Payments and Fees Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the House - House Refuses to Recede
Finance
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0967 Tax Sales - Final Judgments in Foreclosure Actions - Revisions Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0968 Tax Sales - Foreclosure Actions - Assignment of Certificates of Sale Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0991 Tax Sales - Foreclosure of Rights of Redemption Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/24/2022 10:19 AM
Click to return on the top page