Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Flood Control

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0275 /CH0138 (SB0273/CH0139)
Title
Environment – PFAS Chemicals – Prohibitions and Requirements (George “Walter” Taylor Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0653 /CH0237 (SB0348/CH0238)
Title
Conservation Finance Act
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0706 (SB0630/CH0482)
Title
Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Office of Resilience
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0708
Title
Comprehensive Climate Solutions
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0851
Title
Marine Contractor License – Performance of Services – Licensing Requirements and Fees
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1061
Title
Local Government - Condominium and Homeowners Associations - Repair and Rehabilitation Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1311
Title
Chesapeake Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses (Chesapeake Bay Restoration Fund Lockbox Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1312 /CH0244 (SB0814/CH0245)
Title
Public Safety – Resilient Maryland Revolving Loan Fund – Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372
Title
Environment - Green Infrastructure Rebate Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0273 /CH0139 (HB0275/CH0138)
Title
Environment – PFAS Chemicals – Prohibitions and Requirements (George “Walter” Taylor Act)
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0348 /CH0238 (HB0653/CH0237)
Title
Conservation Finance Act
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0528 /CH0038
Title
Climate Solutions Now Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0630 /CH0482 (HB0706)
Title
Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Office of Resilience
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0814 /CH0245 (HB1312/CH0244)
Title
Public Safety - Resilient Maryland Revolving Loan Fund - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0902
Title
Dams With Hydroelectric Power Plants – Annual Compensation Fee
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1007 /CH0233
Title
University System of Maryland - Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0275 /CH0138 (SB0273/CH0139) Environment – PFAS Chemicals – Prohibitions and Requirements (George “Walter” Taylor Act) Delegate Love 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 138
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2022 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0653 /CH0237 (SB0348/CH0238) Conservation Finance Act Delegate Love 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0706 (SB0630/CH0482) Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Office of Resilience Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2022 - 11:00 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0708 Comprehensive Climate Solutions Delegate Barve 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0851 Marine Contractor License – Performance of Services – Licensing Requirements and Fees Calvert County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB1061 Local Government - Condominium and Homeowners Associations - Repair and Rehabilitation Funds Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1311 Chesapeake Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses (Chesapeake Bay Restoration Fund Lockbox Act of 2022) Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Appropriations
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB1312 /CH0244 (SB0814/CH0245) Public Safety – Resilient Maryland Revolving Loan Fund – Alterations Delegate Watson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1372 Environment - Green Infrastructure Rebate Program - Establishment Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2022 - 2:15 PM
SB0273 /CH0139 (HB0275/CH0138) Environment – PFAS Chemicals – Prohibitions and Requirements (George “Walter” Taylor Act) Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0348 /CH0238 (HB0653/CH0237) Conservation Finance Act Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Budget and Taxation
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
SB0528 /CH0038 Climate Solutions Now Act of 2022 Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 38
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0630 /CH0482 (HB0706) Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Office of Resilience Senator Hester 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 482
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0814 /CH0245 (HB1312/CH0244) Public Safety - Resilient Maryland Revolving Loan Fund - Alterations Senator Hester 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245
Budget and Taxation
3/01/2022 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0902 Dams With Hydroelectric Power Plants – Annual Compensation Fee Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB1007 /CH0233 University System of Maryland - Academic Facilities Bonding Authority Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/08/2022 - 1:45 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/24/2022 9:55 AM
Click to return on the top page