Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Fingerprinting

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0218 (SB0016)
Title
Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0540 /CH0093 (SB0139/CH0094)
Title
Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0736 /CH0134 (SB0571/CH0135)
Title
Interstate Licensed Professional Counselors Compact
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0940 /CH0356
Title
Gaming - Regulation of Fantasy Gaming Competitions and Implementation of Sports Wagering - Supplementary Appropriation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1029
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1039 /CH0491 (SB0745/CH0492)
Title
Health Occupations – State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners – Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0016 (HB0218)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0139 /CH0094 (HB0540/CH0093)
Title
Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0571 /CH0135 (HB0736/CH0134)
Title
Interstate Licensed Professional Counselors Compact
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0608
Title
Public Safety – Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0745 /CH0492 (HB1039/CH0491)
Title
Health Occupations – State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0218 (SB0016) Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0540 /CH0093 (SB0139/CH0094) Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact Delegate Morgan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0736 /CH0134 (SB0571/CH0135) Interstate Licensed Professional Counselors Compact Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0940 /CH0356 Gaming - Regulation of Fantasy Gaming Competitions and Implementation of Sports Wagering - Supplementary Appropriation Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 356
Ways and Means
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1029 Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB1039 /CH0491 (SB0745/CH0492) Health Occupations – State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners – Revisions Delegate Kelly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 491
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0016 (HB0218) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0139 /CH0094 (HB0540/CH0093) Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact Senator Carozza 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0571 /CH0135 (HB0736/CH0134) Interstate Licensed Professional Counselors Compact President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0608 Public Safety – Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission Senator Jackson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0745 /CH0492 (HB1039/CH0491) Health Occupations – State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners – Revisions Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 492
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:08 PM
Click to return on the top page