Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Finance Companies

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0693 (SB0754)
Title
Commercial Financing - Small Business Truth in Lending Act
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1018 /CH0202 (SB0689/CH0203)
Title
Financial Institutions - Conventional Home Mortgage Loans - Assumption and Required Disclosures
Sponsor
Delegate Pruski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1516 /CH0119 (SB1026/CH0118)
Title
Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Application of Licensing Requirements (Maryland Secondary Market Stability Act of 2025)
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0689 /CH0203 (HB1018/CH0202)
Title
Financial Institutions - Conventional Home Mortgage Loans - Assumption and Required Disclosures
Sponsor
Senator Gile
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0754 (HB0693)
Title
Commercial Financing - Small Business Truth in Lending Act
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1026 /CH0118 (HB1516/CH0119)
Title
Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Application of Licensing Requirements (Maryland Secondary Market Stability Act of 2025)
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0693 (SB0754) Commercial Financing - Small Business Truth in Lending Act Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Special Order until 04/07 (Delegate Crosby) Adopted
Economic Matters
2/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1018 /CH0202 (SB0689/CH0203) Financial Institutions - Conventional Home Mortgage Loans - Assumption and Required Disclosures Delegate Pruski 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202
Economic Matters
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1516 /CH0119 (SB1026/CH0118) Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Application of Licensing Requirements (Maryland Secondary Market Stability Act of 2025) Delegate Queen 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Economic Matters
3/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0689 /CH0203 (HB1018/CH0202) Financial Institutions - Conventional Home Mortgage Loans - Assumption and Required Disclosures Senator Gile 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Finance
2/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0754 (HB0693) Commercial Financing - Small Business Truth in Lending Act Senator Kramer 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
2/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1026 /CH0118 (HB1516/CH0119) Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Application of Licensing Requirements (Maryland Secondary Market Stability Act of 2025) Senator Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118
Finance
3/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/22/2025 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page