Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Fiduciaries

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0528 /CH0599
Title
Town of Williamsport (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0543 /CH0600
Title
Town of Hancock (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0740 /CH0024 (SB0566/CH0025)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Investment Climate Risk - Fiduciary Duties
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0175 /CH0227
Title
Fiduciary Institutions - Investigation of Financial Abuse and Financial Exploitation - Records Disclosure
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0566 /CH0025 (HB0740/CH0024)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System – Investment Climate Risk – Fiduciary Duties
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0528 /CH0599 Town of Williamsport (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance Delegate McKay 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 599
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0543 /CH0600 Town of Hancock (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance Delegate McKay 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 600
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0740 /CH0024 (SB0566/CH0025) State Retirement and Pension System - Investment Climate Risk - Fiduciary Duties Delegate Lierman 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 24
Appropriations
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0175 /CH0227 Fiduciary Institutions - Investigation of Financial Abuse and Financial Exploitation - Records Disclosure Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Finance
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0566 /CH0025 (HB0740/CH0024) State Retirement and Pension System – Investment Climate Risk – Fiduciary Duties Senator Elfreth 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 25
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2022 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:14 PM
Click to return on the top page