Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Farmland

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0100
Title
Inheritance Tax - Beneficiaries of Limited Means - Installment Payments
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0163 (SB0056)
Title
Food Waste and Solid Waste Reduction - Grants, Fund, and Surcharge
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0402
Title
Real Property - Nuisance and Breach of Lease Actions - Rodent Harborage
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0616 (SB0392)
Title
Agricultural Land - Adversarial Foreign Governments - Restrictions on Property Interests
Sponsor
Delegate Munoz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0640 (SB0869)
Title
Property Tax - Improvements on Agricultural Land - Assessment
Sponsor
Delegate Ziegler
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0885
Title
Agricultural Land and Programs - People's Republic of China
Sponsor
Delegate Chisholm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0914 /CH0505 (SB0746/CH0506)
Title
Winery and Vineyard Economic Development Grant Program - Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0991 /CH0531 (SB1074/CH0532)
Title
Agriculture - Food Processing Residuals Utilization Permit - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1042 (SB0932)
Title
Maryland Agricultural BMP Best in Show Program - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0056 (HB0163)
Title
Food Waste and Solid Waste Reduction – Grants, Fund, and Surcharge
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0105
Title
Burial Sites of Enslaved Persons - Protection and Access (Emancipation for the Maryland Deceased Enslaved Act)
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0392 (HB0616)
Title
Agricultural Land - Adversarial Foreign Governments - Restrictions on Property Interests
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0746 /CH0506 (HB0914/CH0505)
Title
Winery and Vineyard Economic Development Grant Program - Modifications
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0869 (HB0640)
Title
Property Tax - Improvements on Agricultural Land - Assessment
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0932 (HB1042)
Title
Maryland Agricultural BMP Priority Environmental Stewardship Program - Established
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1001 /CH0824 (HB1083/CH0825)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 4 Limited Winery License - Requirements and Authorizations
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1074 /CH0532 (HB0991/CH0531)
Title
Agriculture - Food Processing Residuals Utilization Permit - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0100 Inheritance Tax - Beneficiaries of Limited Means - Installment Payments Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB0163 (SB0056) Food Waste and Solid Waste Reduction - Grants, Fund, and Surcharge Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB0402 Real Property - Nuisance and Breach of Lease Actions - Rodent Harborage Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0616 (SB0392) Agricultural Land - Adversarial Foreign Governments - Restrictions on Property Interests Delegate Munoz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0640 (SB0869) Property Tax - Improvements on Agricultural Land - Assessment Delegate Ziegler 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
HB0885 Agricultural Land and Programs - People's Republic of China Delegate Chisholm 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0914 /CH0505 (SB0746/CH0506) Winery and Vineyard Economic Development Grant Program - Modifications Delegate Jones, D. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 505
Appropriations
3/07/2024 - 3:00 PM
Finance
HB0991 /CH0531 (SB1074/CH0532) Agriculture - Food Processing Residuals Utilization Permit - Establishment Delegate Love 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1042 (SB0932) Maryland Agricultural BMP Best in Show Program - Established Delegate Guzzone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0056 (HB0163) Food Waste and Solid Waste Reduction – Grants, Fund, and Surcharge Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0105 Burial Sites of Enslaved Persons - Protection and Access (Emancipation for the Maryland Deceased Enslaved Act) Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0392 (HB0616) Agricultural Land - Adversarial Foreign Governments - Restrictions on Property Interests Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0746 /CH0506 (HB0914/CH0505) Winery and Vineyard Economic Development Grant Program - Modifications Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 506
Finance
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB0869 (HB0640) Property Tax - Improvements on Agricultural Land - Assessment Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Budget and Taxation
SB0932 (HB1042) Maryland Agricultural BMP Priority Environmental Stewardship Program - Established Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/08/2024 - 9:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1001 /CH0824 (HB1083/CH0825) Alcoholic Beverages - Class 4 Limited Winery License - Requirements and Authorizations Senator Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 824
Finance
2/23/2024 - 10:00 AM
Economic Matters
SB1074 /CH0532 (HB0991/CH0531) Agriculture - Food Processing Residuals Utilization Permit - Establishment Senator Ready 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:40 PM
Click to return on the top page