Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Farmland

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0104 (SB0401/CH0803)
Title
Landlord-Tenant - Nonrenewal of Lease - Notice Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0577
Title
Health and Welfare of H–2 Visa and Migrant Workers – COVID–19 Pandemic – Regulations (Healthy Farmworkers Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0779
Title
Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0815 /CH0609
Title
State Agricultural Land Transfer Tax – Application of Nonagricultural Use Reduction and Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0841 (SB0502)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Agricultural Stands, Retail Farms, and Farmers' Markets
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1131 (SB0612/CH0730)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1356
Title
Blue Ribbon Solar Land Use Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0401 /CH0803 (HB0104)
Title
Landlord-Tenant - Nonrenewal of Lease - Notice Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0502 (HB0841)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Agricultural Stands, Retail Farms, and Farmers' Markets
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0612 /CH0730 (HB1131)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0104 (SB0401/CH0803) Landlord-Tenant - Nonrenewal of Lease - Notice Requirements Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0577 Health and Welfare of H–2 Visa and Migrant Workers – COVID–19 Pandemic – Regulations (Healthy Farmworkers Act) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736
Economic Matters
2/05/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
Finance
4/09/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB0779 Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0815 /CH0609 State Agricultural Land Transfer Tax – Application of Nonagricultural Use Reduction and Exemption Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 609
Ways and Means
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0841 (SB0502) Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Agricultural Stands, Retail Farms, and Farmers' Markets Delegate Otto 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1131 (SB0612/CH0730) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1356 Blue Ribbon Solar Land Use Commission Delegate Barve 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0401 /CH0803 (HB0104) Landlord-Tenant - Nonrenewal of Lease - Notice Requirements Senator Carter 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 803
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0502 (HB0841) Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Agricultural Stands, Retail Farms, and Farmers' Markets Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/18/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0612 /CH0730 (HB1131) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond Carroll County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 730
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 11:52 AM
Click to return on the top page