Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Fairs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0897 /CH0061
Title
Economic Development - Sports Entertainment Facilities and Events, Prince George's County Blue Line Corridor Facilities, and Racing Facilities
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1170 (SB0883)
Title
Public Health - Sickle Cell Disease - Testing at a Community-Based Health Fair
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0883 (HB1170)
Title
Public Health – Sickle Cell Disease – Testing at a Community–Based Health Fair
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0897 /CH0061 Economic Development - Sports Entertainment Facilities and Events, Prince George's County Blue Line Corridor Facilities, and Racing Facilities Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Appropriations
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/08/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB1170 (SB0883) Public Health - Sickle Cell Disease - Testing at a Community-Based Health Fair Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2022 - 2:00 PM
SB0883 (HB1170) Public Health – Sickle Cell Disease – Testing at a Community–Based Health Fair Senator Watson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 1:48 PM
Click to return on the top page