Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Expungement

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0032
Title
Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Inclusion, Restoration, and Rehabilitation Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0238
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0754 (SB0617)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Expungement – Entitlement
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0882 /CH0376 (SB0874/CH0377)
Title
Workgroup to Study Partial Expungement
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1269 (SB0201/CH0680)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Waiting Period
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1281 (SB0844)
Title
Adult Protective Services - Vulnerable Adults Registry - Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1331 (SB0898)
Title
Maryland Criminal Justice Debt Elimination and Prevention Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0114 /CH0620
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Conviction and Subsequent Offender Penalties - Driving While Privilege Is Canceled, Suspended, Refused, or Revoked
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0201 /CH0680 (HB1269)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0617 (HB0754)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Expungement – Entitlement
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0627
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Repeal and Procedures for Discipline
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0702
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Entitlement
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0708
Title
Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0844 (HB1281)
Title
Adult Protective Services - Vulnerable Adults Registry - Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0874 /CH0377 (HB0882/CH0376)
Title
Workgroup to Study Partial Expungement
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0898 (HB1331)
Title
Maryland Criminal Justice Debt Elimination and Prevention Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0963
Title
Criminal Procedure – Expungement – Closed Against Entry
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0032 Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Inclusion, Restoration, and Rehabilitation Act of 2021) Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0238 Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records Delegate Wells 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0754 (SB0617) Criminal Procedure – Expungement – Entitlement Delegate Pippy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0882 /CH0376 (SB0874/CH0377) Workgroup to Study Partial Expungement Delegate Barron 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 376
Judiciary
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1269 (SB0201/CH0680) Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Waiting Period Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1281 (SB0844) Adult Protective Services - Vulnerable Adults Registry - Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1331 (SB0898) Maryland Criminal Justice Debt Elimination and Prevention Act of 2021 Delegate Davis, D.M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0114 /CH0620 Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Conviction and Subsequent Offender Penalties - Driving While Privilege Is Canceled, Suspended, Refused, or Revoked Senator McCray 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 620
Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0201 /CH0680 (HB1269) Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records Senator Patterson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 680
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0617 (HB0754) Criminal Procedure – Expungement – Entitlement Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 2:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2021 - 2:30 PM
SB0627 Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Repeal and Procedures for Discipline Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (94-42)
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0702 Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Entitlement Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 2:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2021 - 2:30 PM
SB0708 Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0844 (HB1281) Adult Protective Services - Vulnerable Adults Registry - Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0874 /CH0377 (HB0882/CH0376) Workgroup to Study Partial Expungement Senator Jackson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 377
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2021 - 12:30 PM
Judiciary
SB0898 (HB1331) Maryland Criminal Justice Debt Elimination and Prevention Act of 2021 Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2021 - 12:00 PM
SB0963 Criminal Procedure – Expungement – Closed Against Entry Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:17 AM
Click to return on the top page