Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Ex-Offenders

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0074 (SB0030)
Title
Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0083 /CH0175 (SB0029)
Title
Family Law - Marriage of Minors
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0158 /CH0485 (SB0554)
Title
Maryland New Start Act of 2022
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0708
Title
Comprehensive Climate Solutions
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1226
Title
Environment - Office of Recycling - Mattress Stewardship Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0029 (HB0083/CH0175)
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0030 (HB0074)
Title
Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0111
Title
Occupational Licenses or Certificates - Pre-application Determinations - Criminal Convictions
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0277
Title
Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center - Division of Correction - Data Requirement
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0528 /CH0038
Title
Climate Solutions Now Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0554 (HB0158/CH0485)
Title
Maryland New Start Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0833
Title
Cannabis Reform
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0904
Title
Maryland Higher Education Commission - Returning Youth Grant Program - Established
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0074 (SB0030) Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0083 /CH0175 (SB0029) Family Law - Marriage of Minors Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175
Judiciary
1/27/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0158 /CH0485 (SB0554) Maryland New Start Act of 2022 Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 485
Ways and Means
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Budget and Taxation
HB0708 Comprehensive Climate Solutions Delegate Barve 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1226 Environment - Office of Recycling - Mattress Stewardship Program - Establishment Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2022 - 2:15 PM
Economic Matters
SB0029 (HB0083/CH0175) Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0030 (HB0074) Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0111 Occupational Licenses or Certificates - Pre-application Determinations - Criminal Convictions Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0277 Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center - Division of Correction - Data Requirement Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0528 /CH0038 Climate Solutions Now Act of 2022 Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 38
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0554 (HB0158/CH0485) Maryland New Start Act of 2022 Senator Patterson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0833 Cannabis Reform Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0904 Maryland Higher Education Commission - Returning Youth Grant Program - Established Senator Benson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:10 PM
Click to return on the top page