Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Executive Orders

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0575
Title
Public Safety – Emergency Limitations (Consent of the Governed Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0760
Title
States of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergencies - Renewals - Authorization by General Assembly or Legislative Policy Committee
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0921 (SB0366)
Title
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of Funds (Chesapeake Bay Lockbox Protection Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1371
Title
Public Safety - States of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergencies - Treatment of Religious Organizations
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0006 (SJ0008)
Title
United States Constitution – Amendments Convention – Limitations on Federal Power
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HS0001
Title
Articles of Impeachment of Governor Lawrence J. Hogan, Jr.
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0171 /CH0093
Title
Environment - Public Participation Modernization Act
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0366 (HB0921)
Title
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of Funds (Chesapeake Bay Lockbox Protection Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0008 (HJ0006)
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal Power
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0575 Public Safety – Emergency Limitations (Consent of the Governed Act) Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0760 States of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergencies - Renewals - Authorization by General Assembly or Legislative Policy Committee Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0921 (SB0366) Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of Funds (Chesapeake Bay Lockbox Protection Act of 2022) Delegate Saab 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1371 Public Safety - States of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergencies - Treatment of Religious Organizations Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2022 - 1:30 PM
HJ0006 (SJ0008) United States Constitution – Amendments Convention – Limitations on Federal Power Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 8:00 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2022 - 8:00 AM
HS0001 Articles of Impeachment of Governor Lawrence J. Hogan, Jr. Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2022 - 8:00 AM
SB0171 /CH0093 Environment - Public Participation Modernization Act Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/18/2022 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0366 (HB0921) Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of Funds (Chesapeake Bay Lockbox Protection Act of 2022) Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SJ0008 (HJ0006) United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal Power Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 1:47 PM
Click to return on the top page