Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Executive Orders

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0508 (SB0210)
Title
COVID-19 Claim - Civil Immunity
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0719 (SB0582)
Title
Commercial Tenants - Personal Liability Clauses - Enforceability
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1126
Title
Unemployment Insurance – Earned Rating Record – Waiver of Benefit Charges Due to COVID–19
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1206
Title
Public Health - COVID-19-Related Order Violations - Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1251 (SB0805)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance – Rate Filings – Discrimination, Trade Secrets, and States of Emergency
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1265 (SB0735)
Title
State Government - Notarial Acts - Remote Notarizations
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1312 (SB0910)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Actions - Catastrophic Health Emergencies
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1318
Title
Maryland Business Tax Relief Act
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1363
Title
Procurement – Discriminatory Hiring Practices – Debarment
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1368
Title
Overdue State Property Taxes – Waiver of Interest and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0210 (HB0508)
Title
COVID-19 Claim - Civil Immunity
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0582 (HB0719)
Title
Commercial Tenants – Personal Liability Clauses – Enforceability
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0735 (HB1265)
Title
State Government - Notarial Acts - Remote Notarizations
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0805 (HB1251)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Rate Filings - Discrimination, Trade Secrets, and States of Emergency
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0910 (HB1312)
Title
COVID-19 Eviction and Housing Relief Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0508 (SB0210) COVID-19 Claim - Civil Immunity Delegate Attar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736
Economic Matters
2/05/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
Finance
4/09/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB0719 (SB0582) Commercial Tenants - Personal Liability Clauses - Enforceability Delegate Moon 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Judiciary
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1126 Unemployment Insurance – Earned Rating Record – Waiver of Benefit Charges Due to COVID–19 Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB1206 Public Health - COVID-19-Related Order Violations - Notice Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1251 (SB0805) Motor Vehicle Insurance – Rate Filings – Discrimination, Trade Secrets, and States of Emergency Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1265 (SB0735) State Government - Notarial Acts - Remote Notarizations Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1312 (SB0910) Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Actions - Catastrophic Health Emergencies Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judiciary
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
HB1318 Maryland Business Tax Relief Act Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1363 Procurement – Discriminatory Hiring Practices – Debarment Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1368 Overdue State Property Taxes – Waiver of Interest and Penalties Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0210 (HB0508) COVID-19 Claim - Civil Immunity Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0582 (HB0719) Commercial Tenants – Personal Liability Clauses – Enforceability Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2021 - 10:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0735 (HB1265) State Government - Notarial Acts - Remote Notarizations Senator West 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0805 (HB1251) Motor Vehicle Insurance - Rate Filings - Discrimination, Trade Secrets, and States of Emergency Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0910 (HB1312) COVID-19 Eviction and Housing Relief Act of 2021 Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2021 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:19 AM
Click to return on the top page