Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Excise Tax

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0032
Title
Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Inclusion, Restoration, and Rehabilitation Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0044 /CH0670
Title
Clean Cars Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0528 /CH0589
Title
St. Mary’s County – Repeal of Impact Fee – Authorization of Building Excise Tax
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0869 (SB0688)
Title
Sales and Use and Vehicle Excise Taxes - Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing and Short-Term Vehicle Rentals - Alterations and Distribution
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1232 /CH0360 (SB0821/CH0359)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1246
Title
Vehicle Excise Tax - Leased Vehicles - Alteration
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0688 (HB0869)
Title
Sales and Use and Vehicle Excise Taxes – Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing and Short–Term Vehicle Rentals – Alterations and Distribution
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0708
Title
Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0821 /CH0359 (HB1232/CH0360)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0032 Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Inclusion, Restoration, and Rehabilitation Act of 2021) Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0044 /CH0670 Clean Cars Act of 2021 Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 670
Environment and Transportation
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0528 /CH0589 St. Mary’s County – Repeal of Impact Fee – Authorization of Building Excise Tax St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 589
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0869 (SB0688) Sales and Use and Vehicle Excise Taxes - Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing and Short-Term Vehicle Rentals - Alterations and Distribution Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1232 /CH0360 (SB0821/CH0359) Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits Delegate Brooks 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 360
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1246 Vehicle Excise Tax - Leased Vehicles - Alteration Delegate Attar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0688 (HB0869) Sales and Use and Vehicle Excise Taxes – Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing and Short–Term Vehicle Rentals – Alterations and Distribution Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0708 Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0821 /CH0359 (HB1232/CH0360) Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits Senator Hester 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:06 PM
Click to return on the top page