Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Eviction

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0018 /CH0746 (SB0154)
Title
Landlord and Tenant – Residential Tenants – Access to Counsel
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0052 (SB0454)
Title
Real Property - Eviction Actions - Alterations in Actions for Repossession
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0112
Title
Residential Property – Eviction Proceedings – Sealing of Court Records
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0129 (SB0070)
Title
Environment - Mold Inspections - Standards, Reporting, and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0499
Title
Rental Housing Restitution Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0574
Title
Montgomery County Stable Homes Act MC 8–21
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0577
Title
Health and Welfare of H–2 Visa and Migrant Workers – COVID–19 Pandemic – Regulations (Healthy Farmworkers Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0697
Title
Residential Property - Eviction Proceedings - Shielding of Court Records
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0729 (SB0530)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Actions - Filing Surcharge and Prohibited Lease Provisions
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0785
Title
Landlord and Tenant – Commencement of Action to Repossess for Failure to Pay Rent – Required Notice and Grace Period
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1070
Title
Baltimore City – Landlord and Tenant – Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1093
Title
Real Property - Emergency Services and Nuisance Actions
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1312 (SB0910)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Actions - Catastrophic Health Emergencies
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1346
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Proceedings - Catastrophic Health Emergencies
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0070 (HB0129)
Title
Environment - Mold Inspections - Standards, Reporting, and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0154 (HB0018/CH0746)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Residential Tenants - Access to Counsel
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0328
Title
Anne Arundel County - Landlord and Tenant - Procedures for Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0454 (HB0052)
Title
Real Property – Alterations in Actions for Repossession and Establishment of Eviction Diversion Program
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0496 /CH0039 (HB0612)
Title
Recovery for the Economy, Livelihoods, Industries, Entrepreneurs, and Families (RELIEF) Act
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0530 (HB0729)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Actions - Filing Surcharge and Prohibited Lease Provisions
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0910 (HB1312)
Title
COVID-19 Eviction and Housing Relief Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0018 /CH0746 (SB0154) Landlord and Tenant – Residential Tenants – Access to Counsel Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 746
Judiciary
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Budget and Taxation
HB0052 (SB0454) Real Property - Eviction Actions - Alterations in Actions for Repossession Delegate Wells 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
HB0112 Residential Property – Eviction Proceedings – Sealing of Court Records Delegate Henson 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0129 (SB0070) Environment - Mold Inspections - Standards, Reporting, and Penalties Delegate Henson 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0499 Rental Housing Restitution Fund - Establishment Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0574 Montgomery County Stable Homes Act MC 8–21 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0577 Health and Welfare of H–2 Visa and Migrant Workers – COVID–19 Pandemic – Regulations (Healthy Farmworkers Act) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0697 Residential Property - Eviction Proceedings - Shielding of Court Records Delegate Williams 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0729 (SB0530) Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Actions - Filing Surcharge and Prohibited Lease Provisions Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0785 Landlord and Tenant – Commencement of Action to Repossess for Failure to Pay Rent – Required Notice and Grace Period Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1070 Baltimore City – Landlord and Tenant – Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1093 Real Property - Emergency Services and Nuisance Actions Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB1312 (SB0910) Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Actions - Catastrophic Health Emergencies Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judiciary
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
HB1346 Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Proceedings - Catastrophic Health Emergencies Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
SB0070 (HB0129) Environment - Mold Inspections - Standards, Reporting, and Penalties Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0154 (HB0018/CH0746) Landlord and Tenant - Residential Tenants - Access to Counsel Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0328 Anne Arundel County - Landlord and Tenant - Procedures for Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0454 (HB0052) Real Property – Alterations in Actions for Repossession and Establishment of Eviction Diversion Program Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0496 /CH0039 (HB0612) Recovery for the Economy, Livelihoods, Industries, Entrepreneurs, and Families (RELIEF) Act President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Budget and Taxation
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0530 (HB0729) Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Actions - Filing Surcharge and Prohibited Lease Provisions President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2021 - 2:00 PM
SB0910 (HB1312) COVID-19 Eviction and Housing Relief Act of 2021 Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2021 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:18 AM
Click to return on the top page