Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Ethnic Affairs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0071
Title
Education - Holocaust Education Assistance Grant Program - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Edelson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0233 /CH0424 (SB0306)
Title
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area Protection Program – Climate, Equity, and Administrative Provisions
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0448 (SB0387)
Title
Korean American Day
Sponsor
Delegate Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0548 /CH0792 (SB1009/CH0793)
Title
Task Force on Responsible Use of Natural Psychedelic Substances
Sponsor
Delegate Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0763 /CH0939
Title
Commission on Hate Crime Response and Prevention - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0851
Title
State Government – Maryland Reparations Commission – Establishment (Maryland Repair Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0890
Title
Public Schools - Discipline-Related Data - Collection and Publication
Sponsor
Delegate Kaufman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1157 /CH0228 (SB0937/CH0227)
Title
Grow Your Own Educators Grant Program - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1181 (SB1058)
Title
Education – Curriculum Standards – Antihate and Holocaust Education (Educate to Stop the Hate Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1257 (SB0917)
Title
Public Schools - Restorative Practices Schools - Comprehensive Plan
Sponsor
Delegate Pasteur
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1333 /CH0787
Title
Public Health - Maryland Commission on Health Equity and Commission on Public Health - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1386 /CH0128
Title
Education - School Employee Antibias Training - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0008
Title
Condemning Islamophobia, Anti-Palestinian Hate, and Antisemitism
Sponsor
Delegate Martinez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0069 /CH0235 (HB0327/CH0236)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Board of Community College Trustees - Membership Alterations and Appointment Requirements
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0105
Title
Burial Sites of Enslaved Persons - Protection and Access (Emancipation for the Maryland Deceased Enslaved Act)
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0306 (HB0233/CH0424)
Title
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area Protection Program - Climate, Equity, and Administrative Provisions
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0387 (HB0448)
Title
Korean American Day
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0917 (HB1257)
Title
Public Schools – Restorative Practices Schools – Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0937 /CH0227 (HB1157/CH0228)
Title
Grow Your Own Educators Grant Program - Established
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0980
Title
Education - Computer Science - Content Standards and Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1058 (HB1181)
Title
Education - Curriculum Standards - Antihate and Holocaust Education (Educate to Stop the Hate Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0071 Education - Holocaust Education Assistance Grant Program - Established Delegate Edelson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0233 /CH0424 (SB0306) Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area Protection Program – Climate, Equity, and Administrative Provisions Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0448 (SB0387) Korean American Day Delegate Watson 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0548 /CH0792 (SB1009/CH0793) Task Force on Responsible Use of Natural Psychedelic Substances Delegate Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 792
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0763 /CH0939 Commission on Hate Crime Response and Prevention - Membership Delegate Attar 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 939
Judiciary
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0851 State Government – Maryland Reparations Commission – Establishment (Maryland Repair Act) Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0890 Public Schools - Discipline-Related Data - Collection and Publication Delegate Kaufman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1157 /CH0228 (SB0937/CH0227) Grow Your Own Educators Grant Program - Established Delegate Wilkins 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Ways and Means
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Education, Energy, and the Environment
Judicial Proceedings
HB1181 (SB1058) Education – Curriculum Standards – Antihate and Holocaust Education (Educate to Stop the Hate Act) Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1257 (SB0917) Public Schools - Restorative Practices Schools - Comprehensive Plan Delegate Pasteur 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Ways and Means
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1333 /CH0787 Public Health - Maryland Commission on Health Equity and Commission on Public Health - Revisions Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 787
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1386 /CH0128 Education - School Employee Antibias Training - Requirements Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128
Ways and Means
2/26/2024 - 11:00 AM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HJ0008 Condemning Islamophobia, Anti-Palestinian Hate, and Antisemitism Delegate Martinez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0069 /CH0235 (HB0327/CH0236) Anne Arundel County - Board of Community College Trustees - Membership Alterations and Appointment Requirements Anne Arundel County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 235
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/24/2024 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB0105 Burial Sites of Enslaved Persons - Protection and Access (Emancipation for the Maryland Deceased Enslaved Act) Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0306 (HB0233/CH0424) Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area Protection Program - Climate, Equity, and Administrative Provisions Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/31/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB0387 (HB0448) Korean American Day Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 9:00 a.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/08/2024 - 9:00 AM
SB0917 (HB1257) Public Schools – Restorative Practices Schools – Establishment Senator Brooks 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0937 /CH0227 (HB1157/CH0228) Grow Your Own Educators Grant Program - Established Senator Augustine 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Ways and Means
Appropriations
SB0980 Education - Computer Science - Content Standards and Requirements Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1058 (HB1181) Education - Curriculum Standards - Antihate and Holocaust Education (Educate to Stop the Hate Act) Senator Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/23/2024 - 9:00 AM
Ways and Means
3/27/2024 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:45 PM
Click to return on the top page