Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Escrow Accounts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0102 (SB0225)
Title
Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0398 (SB0316)
Title
Abundant Affordable Clean Energy - Procurement and Development (AACE Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0505 (SB0434)
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Renaming and Alterations
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0601 /CH0003 (SB1008/CH0004)
Title
Economic Development - Small Business Guaranty Fund - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Phillips
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0870
Title
Tobacco Product Manufacturers - Escrow Act - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1035 (SB0937)
Title
Electricity and Gas - Emissions Reductions, Rate Regulation, Cost Recovery, Infrastructure, Planning, Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard, and Energy Assistance Programs (Next Generation Energy Act)
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1441 (SB0918)
Title
Business Regulation - Electronic Smoking Devices Manufacturers - Certifications
Sponsor
Delegate Rogers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0316 (HB0398)
Title
Abundant Affordable Clean Energy - Procurement and Development (AACE Act)
Sponsor
Senator Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0434 (HB0505)
Title
Empowering New Energy Resources and Green Initiatives Toward a Zero-Emission (ENERGIZE) Maryland Act
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0716
Title
Public Utilities - Nuclear Energy - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard and Procurement (Decarbonization Infrastructure Solutions Act of 2025)
Sponsor
Senator Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0831
Title
Credit Regulation - Reverse Mortgage Loans - Escrow Accounts
Sponsor
Senator Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0918 (HB1441)
Title
Business Regulation - Electronic Smoking Devices Manufacturers - Certifications
Sponsor
Senator Gile
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0937 (HB1035)
Title
Electricity and Gas - Emissions Reductions, Rate Regulation, Cost Recovery, Infrastructure, Planning, Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard, and Energy Assistance Programs (Next Generation Energy Act)
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1008 /CH0004 (HB0601/CH0003)
Title
Economic Development - Small Business Guaranty Fund - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0102 (SB0225) Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Revisions Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
1/30/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0398 (SB0316) Abundant Affordable Clean Energy - Procurement and Development (AACE Act) Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0505 (SB0434) Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Renaming and Alterations Speaker 3 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment
Economic Matters
2/21/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0601 /CH0003 (SB1008/CH0004) Economic Development - Small Business Guaranty Fund - Alterations Delegate Phillips 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3
Ways and Means
2/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0870 Tobacco Product Manufacturers - Escrow Act - Alterations Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1035 (SB0937) Electricity and Gas - Emissions Reductions, Rate Regulation, Cost Recovery, Infrastructure, Planning, Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard, and Energy Assistance Programs (Next Generation Energy Act) Speaker 6 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/28/2025 - 1:30 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1441 (SB0918) Business Regulation - Electronic Smoking Devices Manufacturers - Certifications Delegate Rogers 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0316 (HB0398) Abundant Affordable Clean Energy - Procurement and Development (AACE Act) Senator Brooks 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/13/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0434 (HB0505) Empowering New Energy Resources and Green Initiatives Toward a Zero-Emission (ENERGIZE) Maryland Act President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0716 Public Utilities - Nuclear Energy - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard and Procurement (Decarbonization Infrastructure Solutions Act of 2025) Senator Brooks 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0831 Credit Regulation - Reverse Mortgage Loans - Escrow Accounts Senator Charles 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0918 (HB1441) Business Regulation - Electronic Smoking Devices Manufacturers - Certifications Senator Gile 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0937 (HB1035) Electricity and Gas - Emissions Reductions, Rate Regulation, Cost Recovery, Infrastructure, Planning, Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard, and Energy Assistance Programs (Next Generation Energy Act) President 6 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/28/2025 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB1008 /CH0004 (HB0601/CH0003) Economic Development - Small Business Guaranty Fund - Alterations Senator Hayes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4
Finance
3/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/10/2025 3:37 PM
Click to return on the top page