Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Escrow Accounts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0019
Title
Residential Real Estate Transactions – Escrow Agents and Trust Money
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0129 (SB0070)
Title
Environment - Mold Inspections - Standards, Reporting, and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0852 /CH0382
Title
Property Tax - Tax Sales - Homeowner Protection Program
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0070 (HB0129)
Title
Environment - Mold Inspections - Standards, Reporting, and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0628
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Establishment of Rent Escrow Accounts - Time Limit
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0019 Residential Real Estate Transactions – Escrow Agents and Trust Money Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2021 - 12:30 PM
HB0129 (SB0070) Environment - Mold Inspections - Standards, Reporting, and Penalties Delegate Henson 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0852 /CH0382 Property Tax - Tax Sales - Homeowner Protection Program Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 382
Ways and Means
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0070 (HB0129) Environment - Mold Inspections - Standards, Reporting, and Penalties Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0628 Landlord and Tenant - Establishment of Rent Escrow Accounts - Time Limit Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 4:11 PM
Click to return on the top page