Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Erosion -see also- Sediment Control; Shore Erosion

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0635 /CH0099 (SB0539/CH0098)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Special Taxing Districts - Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Rogers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0851
Title
Marine Contractor License – Performance of Services – Licensing Requirements and Fees
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1300 /CH0473
Title
Beach Erosion Control District - State- and City-Owned Structures
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0064 /CH0474
Title
Beach Erosion Control District - State- and City-Owned Structures
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0539 /CH0098 (HB0635/CH0099)
Title
Anne Arundel County – Special Taxing Districts – Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0635 /CH0099 (SB0539/CH0098) Anne Arundel County - Special Taxing Districts - Exemptions Delegate Rogers 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Ways and Means
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0851 Marine Contractor License – Performance of Services – Licensing Requirements and Fees Calvert County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB1300 /CH0473 Beach Erosion Control District - State- and City-Owned Structures Delegate Hartman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2022 - 2:15 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0064 /CH0474 Beach Erosion Control District - State- and City-Owned Structures Senator Carozza 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0539 /CH0098 (HB0635/CH0099) Anne Arundel County – Special Taxing Districts – Exemptions Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Budget and Taxation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/22/2022 4:19 PM
Click to return on the top page