Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Enterprise Zones

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0027 /CH0449 (SB0289/CH0450)
Title
Historic Revitalization and Enterprise Zone Tax Credits - Alterations and Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0478 /CH0732
Title
Economic Development - Enterprise Zone Program - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0929
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Opportunity Zone Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1096
Title
Economic Development Tax Credit Programs – Qualified Position and Qualified Employee – Definitions
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0289 /CH0450 (HB0027/CH0449)
Title
Historic Revitalization and Enterprise Zone Tax Credits - Alterations and Eligibility
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0391 /CH0136 (HB0418)
Title
Economic Development - More Jobs for Marylanders Program - Extension and Alterations
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0027 /CH0449 (SB0289/CH0450) Historic Revitalization and Enterprise Zone Tax Credits - Alterations and Eligibility Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 449
Ways and Means
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0478 /CH0732 Economic Development - Enterprise Zone Program - Alterations Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 732
Ways and Means
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0929 Department of Housing and Community Development - Opportunity Zone Fund - Establishment Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1096 Economic Development Tax Credit Programs – Qualified Position and Qualified Employee – Definitions Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0289 /CH0450 (HB0027/CH0449) Historic Revitalization and Enterprise Zone Tax Credits - Alterations and Eligibility Senator McCray 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Budget and Taxation
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0391 /CH0136 (HB0418) Economic Development - More Jobs for Marylanders Program - Extension and Alterations President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136
Budget and Taxation
2/08/2022 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/23/2022 4:31 PM
Click to return on the top page