Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Engineers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0079 (SB0161)
Title
Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0593
Title
Department of Natural Resources - Oyster Shell Dredging - Permit Application
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0161 (HB0079)
Title
Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0211 /CH0126
Title
State Board for Professional Engineers - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0541 /CH0039 (HB0727)
Title
Natural Resources - Maryland Park Service and State Parks - Alterations (Great Maryland Outdoors Act)
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0756
Title
University System of Maryland - County School Technology Pilot Program - Established
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0927
Title
Business Occupations and Professions – Professional Engineers – Examination
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0974
Title
Department of Natural Resources' Real Property - Exchange With Private Real Property
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0079 (SB0161) Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0593 Department of Natural Resources - Oyster Shell Dredging - Permit Application Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0161 (HB0079) Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements Senator West 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0211 /CH0126 State Board for Professional Engineers - Sunset Extension Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 126
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0541 /CH0039 (HB0727) Natural Resources - Maryland Park Service and State Parks - Alterations (Great Maryland Outdoors Act) Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 39
Budget and Taxation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
Appropriations
SB0756 University System of Maryland - County School Technology Pilot Program - Established Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0927 Business Occupations and Professions – Professional Engineers – Examination Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB0974 Department of Natural Resources' Real Property - Exchange With Private Real Property Senator Jennings 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/24/2022 11:16 AM
Click to return on the top page