Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Engineers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0066 (SB0148)
Title
Electric Generation - Transition From Fossil Fuels - Carbon Dioxide Emissions Rate and Transition Plan and Fund (Maryland Coal Community Transition Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0213 (SB0189)
Title
Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0414 /CH0738 (SB0081/CH0739)
Title
Southern Maryland Rapid Transit Project - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0740 (SB0576)
Title
Building Opportunity Act of 2021
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1073 (SB0636/CH0583)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Neighborhood Revitalization - Passive House Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Bridges
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0148 (HB0066)
Title
Electric Generation – Transition From Fossil Fuels – Carbon Dioxide Emissions Rate and Transition Plan and Fund (Maryland Coal Community Transition Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0189 (HB0213)
Title
Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0576 (HB0740)
Title
Building Opportunity Act of 2021
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0636 /CH0583 (HB1073)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Neighborhood Revitalization - Passive House Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0066 (SB0148) Electric Generation - Transition From Fossil Fuels - Carbon Dioxide Emissions Rate and Transition Plan and Fund (Maryland Coal Community Transition Act of 2021) Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0213 (SB0189) Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0414 /CH0738 (SB0081/CH0739) Southern Maryland Rapid Transit Project - Funding Delegate Davis, D.M. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 738
Appropriations
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
HB0740 (SB0576) Building Opportunity Act of 2021 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
HB1073 (SB0636/CH0583) Housing and Community Development - Neighborhood Revitalization - Passive House Pilot Program Delegate Bridges 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0148 (HB0066) Electric Generation – Transition From Fossil Fuels – Carbon Dioxide Emissions Rate and Transition Plan and Fund (Maryland Coal Community Transition Act of 2021) Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0189 (HB0213) Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0576 (HB0740) Building Opportunity Act of 2021 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Budget and Taxation
SB0636 /CH0583 (HB1073) Housing and Community Development - Neighborhood Revitalization - Passive House Pilot Program Senator Hayes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 583
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2021 - 1:15 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:18 AM
Click to return on the top page