Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

emermand

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0386 /CH0490 (SB0310/CH0491)
Title
Anne Arundel County and City of Annapolis - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Local State of Emergency
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0706 (SB0630/CH0482)
Title
Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Office of Resilience
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0898
Title
Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Office of Domestic Terrorism Response
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1003 (SB0749)
Title
Public Safety - 3-1-1 Systems - Nonemergency Information
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1202 (SB0754/CH0241)
Title
Local Government Cybersecurity - Coordination and Operations (Local Cybersecurity Support Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1312 /CH0244 (SB0814/CH0245)
Title
Public Safety – Resilient Maryland Revolving Loan Fund – Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1339 (SB0810)
Title
Cybersecurity - Critical Infrastructure and Public Service Companies (Critical Infrastructure Security Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1346 (SB0812/CH0242)
Title
State Government - Cybersecurity - Coordination and Governance
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1439 (SB0932/CH0281)
Title
Maryland Intrastate Emergency Management Assistance Compact – City of Bowie
Sponsor
Delegate Landis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0310 /CH0491 (HB0386/CH0490)
Title
Anne Arundel County and City of Annapolis - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Local State of Emergency
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0630 /CH0482 (HB0706)
Title
Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Office of Resilience
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0749 (HB1003)
Title
Public Safety - 3-1-1 Systems - Nonemergency Information
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0754 /CH0241 (HB1202)
Title
Local Government Cybersecurity - Coordination and Operations (Local Cybersecurity Support Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0780
Title
Cybersecurity Governance Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0810 (HB1339)
Title
Cybersecurity - Critical Infrastructure and Public Service Companies (Critical Infrastructure Security Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0812 /CH0242 (HB1346)
Title
State Government - Cybersecurity - Coordination and Governance
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0814 /CH0245 (HB1312/CH0244)
Title
Public Safety - Resilient Maryland Revolving Loan Fund - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0932 /CH0281 (HB1439)
Title
Maryland Intrastate Emergency Management Assistance Compact - City of Bowie
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0386 /CH0490 (SB0310/CH0491) Anne Arundel County and City of Annapolis - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Local State of Emergency Delegate Jones, D. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 490
Ways and Means
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0706 (SB0630/CH0482) Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Office of Resilience Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2022 - 11:00 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0898 Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Office of Domestic Terrorism Response Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1003 (SB0749) Public Safety - 3-1-1 Systems - Nonemergency Information Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1202 (SB0754/CH0241) Local Government Cybersecurity - Coordination and Operations (Local Cybersecurity Support Act of 2022) Delegate Young, P. 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1312 /CH0244 (SB0814/CH0245) Public Safety – Resilient Maryland Revolving Loan Fund – Alterations Delegate Watson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1339 (SB0810) Cybersecurity - Critical Infrastructure and Public Service Companies (Critical Infrastructure Security Act of 2022) Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1346 (SB0812/CH0242) State Government - Cybersecurity - Coordination and Governance Delegate Young, P. 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1439 (SB0932/CH0281) Maryland Intrastate Emergency Management Assistance Compact – City of Bowie Delegate Landis 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Health and Government Operations
4/05/2022 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0310 /CH0491 (HB0386/CH0490) Anne Arundel County and City of Annapolis - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Local State of Emergency Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 491
Budget and Taxation
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0630 /CH0482 (HB0706) Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Office of Resilience Senator Hester 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 482
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0749 (HB1003) Public Safety - 3-1-1 Systems - Nonemergency Information Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0754 /CH0241 (HB1202) Local Government Cybersecurity - Coordination and Operations (Local Cybersecurity Support Act of 2022) Senator Hester 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0780 Cybersecurity Governance Act of 2022 Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0810 (HB1339) Cybersecurity - Critical Infrastructure and Public Service Companies (Critical Infrastructure Security Act of 2022) Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0812 /CH0242 (HB1346) State Government - Cybersecurity - Coordination and Governance Senator Hester 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 242
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0814 /CH0245 (HB1312/CH0244) Public Safety - Resilient Maryland Revolving Loan Fund - Alterations Senator Hester 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245
Budget and Taxation
3/01/2022 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0932 /CH0281 (HB1439) Maryland Intrastate Emergency Management Assistance Compact - City of Bowie Senator Watson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 281
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2022 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 4:14 PM
Click to return on the top page