Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Elevators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0257 (SB0034)
Title
Residential Elevators - Inspections
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0611 (SB0259/CH0051)
Title
Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0034 (HB0257)
Title
Residential Elevators - Inspections
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0259 /CH0051 (HB0611)
Title
Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0257 (SB0034) Residential Elevators - Inspections Delegate Bagnall 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB0611 (SB0259/CH0051) Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0034 (HB0257) Residential Elevators - Inspections Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0259 /CH0051 (HB0611) Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability Senator Feldman 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 51
Finance
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/31/2022 5:15 PM
Click to return on the top page