Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Electricians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0611 (SB0259/CH0051)
Title
Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1285 /CH0655 (SB0604/CH0656)
Title
Maryland Electricians Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0182 /CH0122
Title
State Board of Electricians - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0259 /CH0051 (HB0611)
Title
Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0604 /CH0656 (HB1285/CH0655)
Title
Maryland Electricians Act – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0611 (SB0259/CH0051) Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1285 /CH0655 (SB0604/CH0656) Maryland Electricians Act - Revisions Delegate Hornberger 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 655
Economic Matters
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0182 /CH0122 State Board of Electricians - Sunset Extension Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0259 /CH0051 (HB0611) Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability Senator Feldman 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 51
Finance
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0604 /CH0656 (HB1285/CH0655) Maryland Electricians Act – Revisions Senator McCray 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 656
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:23 PM
Click to return on the top page