Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Easements

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0318 /CH0419 (SB0479)
Title
Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0653 /CH0237 (SB0348/CH0238)
Title
Conservation Finance Act
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0884 /CH0339
Title
State Conservation Land - Old-Growth Forests - Management
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0348 /CH0238 (HB0653/CH0237)
Title
Conservation Finance Act
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0479 (HB0318/CH0419)
Title
Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0974
Title
Department of Natural Resources' Real Property - Exchange With Private Real Property
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0318 /CH0419 (SB0479) Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0653 /CH0237 (SB0348/CH0238) Conservation Finance Act Delegate Love 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0884 /CH0339 State Conservation Land - Old-Growth Forests - Management Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0348 /CH0238 (HB0653/CH0237) Conservation Finance Act Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Budget and Taxation
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
SB0479 (HB0318/CH0419) Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation Senator Hester 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0974 Department of Natural Resources' Real Property - Exchange With Private Real Property Senator Jennings 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 2:45 PM
Click to return on the top page