Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Easements

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0991 /CH0645
Title
Tree Solutions Now Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1131 (SB0612/CH0730)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1132 (SB0839)
Title
Maryland Historical Trust - Warfield Complex in Carroll County - Extinguishment or Termination of Easement
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0612 /CH0730 (HB1131)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0737
Title
Comprehensive Conservation Finance Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0839 (HB1132)
Title
Maryland Historical Trust - Warfield Complex in Carroll County - Extinguishment or Termination of Easement
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0991 /CH0645 Tree Solutions Now Act of 2021 Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 645
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1131 (SB0612/CH0730) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1132 (SB0839) Maryland Historical Trust - Warfield Complex in Carroll County - Extinguishment or Termination of Easement Carroll County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
SB0612 /CH0730 (HB1131) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond Carroll County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 730
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0737 Comprehensive Conservation Finance Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
SB0839 (HB1132) Maryland Historical Trust - Warfield Complex in Carroll County - Extinguishment or Termination of Easement Carroll County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:20 AM
Click to return on the top page