Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Driver Education

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0750 (SB0422)
Title
Education - Jobs That Require Driving - Requirements (Drivers Education for Good Jobs Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1025
Title
Vehicle Laws – Driver Education – Self–Paced, Online Instruction
Sponsor
Delegate Forbes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1289
Title
Vehicle Laws - Learner's Instructional Permits and Identification Cards - Required Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0422 (HB0750)
Title
Education – Jobs That Require Driving – Requirements (Drivers Education for Good Jobs Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0599
Title
Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses – Driver Skills Examinations
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0750 (SB0422) Education - Jobs That Require Driving - Requirements (Drivers Education for Good Jobs Act of 2022) Delegate Jones, D. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1025 Vehicle Laws – Driver Education – Self–Paced, Online Instruction Delegate Forbes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1289 Vehicle Laws - Learner's Instructional Permits and Identification Cards - Required Documents Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
SB0422 (HB0750) Education – Jobs That Require Driving – Requirements (Drivers Education for Good Jobs Act of 2022) Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0599 Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses – Driver Skills Examinations Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/23/2022 11:42 AM
Click to return on the top page