Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Dredging

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0500
Title
Dredging on Man–O–War Shoals – Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0593
Title
Department of Natural Resources - Oyster Shell Dredging - Permit Application
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1126 (SB0854)
Title
Graywater Systems - Public and Private Buildings - Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0854 (HB1126)
Title
Graywater Systems – Public and Private Buildings – Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0979
Title
Prohibition of Dredging on Man-O-War Shoals
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0500 Dredging on Man–O–War Shoals – Prohibition Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0593 Department of Natural Resources - Oyster Shell Dredging - Permit Application Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1126 (SB0854) Graywater Systems - Public and Private Buildings - Authorization Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0854 (HB1126) Graywater Systems – Public and Private Buildings – Authorization Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0979 Prohibition of Dredging on Man-O-War Shoals Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/11/2022 11:57 AM
Click to return on the top page