Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Dorchester County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0279 (SB0312)
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Hoopers Island and Taylors Island
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1279 /CH0206 (SB0778/CH0207)
Title
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0312 (HB0279)
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Hoopers Island and Taylors Island
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0778 /CH0207 (HB1279/CH0206)
Title
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program – Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0955
Title
Local Government Tort Claims Act - Cambridge Waterfront Development, Inc.
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0279 (SB0312) Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Hoopers Island and Taylors Island Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1279 /CH0206 (SB0778/CH0207) Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program - Alterations Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 206
Ways and Means
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0312 (HB0279) Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Hoopers Island and Taylors Island Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
SB0778 /CH0207 (HB1279/CH0206) Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program – Alterations Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0955 Local Government Tort Claims Act - Cambridge Waterfront Development, Inc. Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/20/2021 5:42 PM
Click to return on the top page