Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Domestic Violence -see also- Child Abuse & Neglect

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0050 (SB0967)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Tenant Rights and Protections (Tenant Protection Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0281 /CH0226 (SB0159/CH0227)
Title
Local Government - Humane Society and Animal Control Officers - Education and Training Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0502 (SB0456)
Title
Office of the State’s Attorney – Collection and Publication of Prosecutorial Information
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0720 (SB0629)
Title
Intercepted Communications - Penalties and Admissibility of Evidence
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0744 /CH0330
Title
Courts – Counsel Appearance Fees – Domestic Violence
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0748 (SB0057)
Title
Family Law – Child Custody and Visitation
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1036 (SB0675)
Title
Child Custody – Cases Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence – Training for Judges and Child’s Counsel
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0057 (HB0748)
Title
Family Law – Child Custody and Visitation
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0109 /CH0124
Title
Secretary of State - Address Confidentiality Programs - Merger of Programs and Expanded Participant Eligibility
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0159 /CH0227 (HB0281/CH0226)
Title
Local Government - Humane Society and Animal Control Officers - Education and Training Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0299 /CH0723 (HB0548/CH0722)
Title
Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training (Healing Maryland's Trauma Act)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0355
Title
Family Law – Custody Evaluators – Qualifications and Training
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0456 (HB0502)
Title
Office of the State's Attorney - Collection and Publication of Prosecutorial Information
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0629 (HB0720)
Title
Intercepted Communications - Penalties and Admissibility of Evidence
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0675 (HB1036)
Title
Child Custody - Cases Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence - Training for Judges and Child's Counsel
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0775
Title
Family Law - Child Custody and Visitation - Abuse
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0967 (HB0050)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Tenant Rights and Protections (Tenant Protection Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0050 (SB0967) Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Tenant Rights and Protections (Tenant Protection Act of 2021) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0281 /CH0226 (SB0159/CH0227) Local Government - Humane Society and Animal Control Officers - Education and Training Requirements Delegate Chang 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 226
Environment and Transportation
1/29/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0502 (SB0456) Office of the State’s Attorney – Collection and Publication of Prosecutorial Information Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB0720 (SB0629) Intercepted Communications - Penalties and Admissibility of Evidence Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0744 /CH0330 Courts – Counsel Appearance Fees – Domestic Violence Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330
Judiciary
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0748 (SB0057) Family Law – Child Custody and Visitation Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1036 (SB0675) Child Custody – Cases Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence – Training for Judges and Child’s Counsel Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0057 (HB0748) Family Law – Child Custody and Visitation Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0109 /CH0124 Secretary of State - Address Confidentiality Programs - Merger of Programs and Expanded Participant Eligibility Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2021 - 11:30 AM
Judiciary
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0159 /CH0227 (HB0281/CH0226) Local Government - Humane Society and Animal Control Officers - Education and Training Requirements Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Judicial Proceedings
1/20/2021 - 11:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
SB0299 /CH0723 (HB0548/CH0722) Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training (Healing Maryland's Trauma Act) Senator Carter 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 723
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0355 Family Law – Custody Evaluators – Qualifications and Training Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0456 (HB0502) Office of the State's Attorney - Collection and Publication of Prosecutorial Information Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0629 (HB0720) Intercepted Communications - Penalties and Admissibility of Evidence Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0675 (HB1036) Child Custody - Cases Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence - Training for Judges and Child's Counsel Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0775 Family Law - Child Custody and Visitation - Abuse Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0967 (HB0050) Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Tenant Rights and Protections (Tenant Protection Act of 2021) Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:19 AM
Click to return on the top page