Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Domestic Partnerships and Civil Unions

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0575 /CH0705 (SB0471)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim Compensation - Alterations (Victim Compensation Reform Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0025
Title
Property Tax Credit - Disabled or Fallen Law Enforcement Officer or Rescue Worker - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0471 (HB0575/CH0705)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim Compensation - Alterations (Victim Compensation Reform Act of 2024)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0575 /CH0705 (SB0471) Criminal Procedure - Victim Compensation - Alterations (Victim Compensation Reform Act of 2024) Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 705
Judiciary
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0025 Property Tax Credit - Disabled or Fallen Law Enforcement Officer or Rescue Worker - Alterations Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2024 - 12:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0471 (HB0575/CH0705) Criminal Procedure - Victim Compensation - Alterations (Victim Compensation Reform Act of 2024) President 3 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2024 - 12:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/22/2024 9:45 AM
Click to return on the top page