Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Domestic Animals -see also- Birds; Dogs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0085 (SB0641)
Title
Department of Agriculture - Spay/Neuter Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0357 (SB0193)
Title
Agriculture - Confinement of Egg-Laying Hens in Commercial Egg Production - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0444 (SB0339)
Title
Environment - Duck Nest Boxes - Wetlands License Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0647 /CH0740
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance – Pet Insurance – Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1107
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Spaying and Neutering Dogs and Cats
Sponsor
Delegate Rose
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1179
Title
Housing and Community Development - Pets in Housing Developments
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0017 (HB0667)
Title
Criminal Law - Crimes Relating to Animals - Conviction and Sentencing
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0157
Title
Domestic Animals - Penalties for Abandonment and Microchip Requirements for Dogs
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0193 (HB0357)
Title
Agriculture - Confinement of Egg-Laying Hens in Commercial Egg Production - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Lewis Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0339 (HB0444)
Title
Environment - Duck Nest Boxes - Wetlands License Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0641 (HB0085)
Title
Department of Agriculture - Spay/Neuter Fund
Sponsor
Senator Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0868
Title
Civil Actions – Injury to or Death of Pet – Damages
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0085 (SB0641) Department of Agriculture - Spay/Neuter Fund Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
HB0357 (SB0193) Agriculture - Confinement of Egg-Laying Hens in Commercial Egg Production - Prohibitions Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:15 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2024 - 1:15 PM
HB0444 (SB0339) Environment - Duck Nest Boxes - Wetlands License Requirements Delegate Otto 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB0647 /CH0740 Property and Casualty Insurance – Pet Insurance – Regulation Delegate Guyton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 740
Economic Matters
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Finance
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1107 Income Tax - Credit for Spaying and Neutering Dogs and Cats Delegate Rose 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1179 Housing and Community Development - Pets in Housing Developments Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0017 (HB0667) Criminal Law - Crimes Relating to Animals - Conviction and Sentencing Senator West 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judicial Proceedings
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0157 Domestic Animals - Penalties for Abandonment and Microchip Requirements for Dogs Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 2:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2024 - 2:30 PM
SB0193 (HB0357) Agriculture - Confinement of Egg-Laying Hens in Commercial Egg Production - Prohibitions Senator Lewis Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/23/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0339 (HB0444) Environment - Duck Nest Boxes - Wetlands License Requirements Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Energy, and the Environment
SB0641 (HB0085) Department of Agriculture - Spay/Neuter Fund Senator Brooks 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 9:00 a.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/16/2024 - 9:00 AM
SB0868 Civil Actions – Injury to or Death of Pet – Damages Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:37 PM
Click to return on the top page