Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Divorce -see also- Annulment

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0083 /CH0175 (SB0029)
Title
Family Law - Marriage of Minors
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0639
Title
Family Law - Grounds for Divorce
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1319
Title
Family Law - Grounds for Divorce - Gender Transition
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0083 /CH0175 (SB0029) Family Law - Marriage of Minors Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175
Judiciary
1/27/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0639 Family Law - Grounds for Divorce Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1319 Family Law - Grounds for Divorce - Gender Transition Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:12 AM
Click to return on the top page