Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

District of Columbia

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0666 (SB0280)
Title
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority – Metro Transit Police – Quotas and Metro Transit Police Complaints Board
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0966
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Qualification License - Training Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1253 (SB0509/CH0707)
Title
National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Eligibility and Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0005
Title
United States of America – District of Columbia – Statehood
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0097
Title
Purple Line Marketing Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0280 (HB0666)
Title
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority – Metro Transit Police – Quotas and Police Complaints Board
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0509 /CH0707 (HB1253)
Title
National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Eligibility and Funding
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0666 (SB0280) Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority – Metro Transit Police – Quotas and Metro Transit Police Complaints Board Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0966 Public Safety - Handgun Qualification License - Training Exemption Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1253 (SB0509/CH0707) National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Eligibility and Funding Delegate Washington 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HJ0005 United States of America – District of Columbia – Statehood Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 9:30 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/15/2021 - 9:30 AM
SB0097 Purple Line Marketing Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Finance
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0280 (HB0666) Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority – Metro Transit Police – Quotas and Police Complaints Board Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0509 /CH0707 (HB1253) National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Eligibility and Funding Senator Peters 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 707
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:21 AM
Click to return on the top page