Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Disabilities, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0355 /CH0217
Title
Prince George's County Board of Education - Workgroup, Alterations, and Orientation Requirement PG 503-22
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0547 (SB0617/CH0215)
Title
Local School Systems - Equivalent Access Standards - Digital Tools (Equivalent and Nonvisual Access Accountability Act for K-12 Education)
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0660 /CH0331
Title
Commission to Study the Division of Rehabilitation Services (Student Job Training Reformation Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0617 /CH0215 (HB0547)
Title
Local School Systems - Equivalent Access Standards - Digital Tools (Equivalent and Nonvisual Access Accountability Act for K-12 Education)
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0355 /CH0217 Prince George's County Board of Education - Workgroup, Alterations, and Orientation Requirement PG 503-22 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0547 (SB0617/CH0215) Local School Systems - Equivalent Access Standards - Digital Tools (Equivalent and Nonvisual Access Accountability Act for K-12 Education) Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0660 /CH0331 Commission to Study the Division of Rehabilitation Services (Student Job Training Reformation Act) Delegate Guyton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331
Ways and Means
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0617 /CH0215 (HB0547) Local School Systems - Equivalent Access Standards - Digital Tools (Equivalent and Nonvisual Access Accountability Act for K-12 Education) Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 215
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/24/2022 1:35 PM
Click to return on the top page